EP3803687 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR UTILIZING QUANTITATIVE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elucid Bioimaging Inc. 2 Park Plaza, Suite 305 Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2021/30] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Elucid Bioimaging Inc. 225 Main Street Suite 15 Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCKLER, Mark A. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 2 Park Plaza, Suite 305 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 02 /
PAIK, David S. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 2 Park Plaza, Suite 305 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 03 /
VALTCHINOV, Vladimir c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 2 Park Plaza, Suite 305 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 04 /
BUCKLER, Andrew J. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 2 Park Plaza, Suite 305 Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
BUCKLER, Mark A. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 225 Main Street Suite 15 Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | ||
02 /
PAIK, David S. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 225 Main Street Suite 15 Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | |||
03 /
VALTCHINOV, Vladimir c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 225 Main Street Suite 15 Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | |||
04 /
BUCKLER, Andrew J. c/o ELUCID BIOIMAGING INC. 225 Main Street Suite 15 Wenham, Massachusetts 01984 / US | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19811880.4 | 24.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US33930 | Priority number, date | US201862676975P | 27.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862676975 P | US201862771448P | 26.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862771448 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231844 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3803687 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T7/60, G06T7/10, G06T7/00, G06K9/62, G06V10/44, G06V10/82 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
G06V10/454 (EP,KR,US);
G06F18/2414 (EP,KR);
G06F18/2193 (EP,KR);
G06N3/08 (KR);
G06T7/0012 (EP,KR);
G06T7/10 (EP,KR);
G06T7/60 (EP,KR);
G06V10/82 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/10072 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR VERWENDUNG VON QUANTITATIVER BILDGEBUNG | [2021/15] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR UTILIZING QUANTITATIVE IMAGING | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'UTILISATION D'IMAGERIE QUANTITATIVE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017046839 (PAIK DAVID S [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2005118632 (CHEN JIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2009258925 (WAHLESTEDT CLAES [US]); | [A]US2011027181 (AMODEI DARIO G [US], et al) |