EP3805654 - AIR CONDITIONING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUNO, Hideki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
KITADE, Yukio c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
OGISO, Yuuki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19812093.3 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019JP20016 | Priority number, date | JP20180104938 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018104938 | [2021/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019230487 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805654 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/58, F24F11/32, H04Q9/00, G08C17/02 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP);
F24F11/32 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,US);
F24F11/56 (US);
F24F11/58 (EP);
F24F11/64 (US);
F24F11/65 (US);
G05B19/042 (US);
F24F11/36 (EP);
F24F2110/10 (US);
F24F2140/50 (US);
F24F2140/60 (US);
G05B2219/2614 (US);
G08C2201/30 (EP);
G08C2201/50 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | F24F11/58, F24F11/32, H04Q9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNGSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2021/15] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING MANAGEMENT SYSTEM AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CLIMATISATION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2020 | Translation filed | 30.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 26.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 26.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004232980 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XI]US2015292763 (JUNG SEUNGHWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 37 - column 407; figures 1-13 * [I] 5-7; | [XI]US2016334127 (RUPP STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4; claims 1-2 * [I] 5-7; | [X]US2017314797 (BLAIR DANIEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-4; claim 21 *; | [XI]JP2018059706 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-4,8-10 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0230]; figures 1-21 * [I] 5-7 | International search | [Y]JP2004232980 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 1-10 * , *; | [A]JP2006013861 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-10* , *; | [Y]JP2006165627 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-10 * , [009]-[0029], * | by applicant | JP3731120B |