EP3802495 - HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C&C Research Laboratories Sungkyunkwan University 2066 Seobu-ro Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Chan Hee C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 02 /
IM, Jun Hwan C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Soon Ok C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sang Hwi C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 05 /
KO, Kwang Seok C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Byung Ho C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 07 /
MOON, Hyung Jo C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 08 /
KIM, Jae Ill C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 09 /
PARK, Heon Kyu C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | 10 /
HONG, Yeon Ju C&C Research Labs., DRC, Sungkyunkwan University 2066, Seobu-ro, Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16419 / KR | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Wohlfahrt, Jan Günther, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19812552.8 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019KR06554 | Priority number, date | KR20180062450 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180062450 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231271 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802495 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/38, C07D215/48, C07D215/50, C07D239/94, C07D471/04, C07D487/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/47, A61K31/502, A61K31/517, A61K31/53, A61P31/06, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
A61P31/06 (EP,KR);
C07D215/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/72 (US);
A61K31/47 (KR);
A61K31/502 (KR);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61K31/53 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P37/00 (EP,KR);
C07D215/48 (EP,US);
C07D215/50 (EP);
C07D239/94 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP);
C07D473/34 (US);
C07D487/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | C07D215/38, A61K31/47, A61K31/502, A61K31/517, A61K31/53, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P31/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/15] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES AND USE THEREOF | [2021/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008086462 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 38; intermediates of formula (VI) * * example 264; page 123, paragraph [00382] to paragraph [00384]; (2N-dimethylamino-7-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-(4-nitro-benzyl)-amine; (4-Amino-benzyl)-(2-methylamino-7-methyl-quinazolin- 4-yl)-amine; (2N-methylamino-8-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-(4-nitro-benzyl)-amine; (2-Chloro-8-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-(4-nitro-benzyl)-amine; (2N-dimethylamino-8-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-(4-nitro- benzyl)-amine; (4-Amino-benzyl)-(2-methylamino-8-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-amine (2N-methylamino-7-methyl-quinazolin-4-yl)-(4-nitro-benzyl)-amine *; | [X]WO2010036629 (NAT HEALTH RESEARCH INSTITUTES, et al) [X] 1-13 * page 36; lines 10 to 12; example 2; intermediate in the preparation of compound 6; N-[2-(4-aminophenyl)ethyl]-7-(3-chloropropoxy)-4-quinazolinamine (STN-RN: 1220105-88-3) *; | [XI]WO2010093419 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 42; table; compound 151 * * claims 1, 10 * [I] 1-13; | [XI]WO2012079079 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 15; figure page 33/46; compound C72; N-[(4-aminophenyl)methyl]-6-chloro-4-quinazolinamine (STN-RN: 1262888-97-0); intermediate in the preparation of compound C72; 6-chloro-N-[(4-nitrophenyl)methyl]-4-quinazolinamine; STN-RN: 1262888-82-3 * * claims 1, 125 * [I] 1-13; | [XPI]WO2019046778 (MAVUPHARMA INC [US]) [XP] 1-13 * page 9; 3rd, 7th and 9th compound * * page 99 - page 114; compounds 230, 247, 293, 306, 406 * * claims 97, 123-144 *[I] 1-13 | International search | [X]WO2005061516 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * See claims 1-4; page 24; example 11. *; | [X]WO2009007422 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * See claims 1, 4-18; compound 20. *; | [A]US2010234324 (EGGENWEILER HANS-MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2011172429 (ASAI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* See the whole document. *; | [X]WO2014145512 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * See abstract; claims 1-3, 8; pages 5-7, 19; figure 1. * | by applicant | WO2005061516 | WO2008086462 | WO2009007422 | WO2010036629 | WO2010093419 | US2010234324 | US2011172429 | WO2012079079 | WO2014145512 | WO2019046778 | - BECKER S et al., Nature, (19980000), page 394 | - VINKEMEIER U et al., Science, (19980000), page 279 | - CHEN X et al., Cell, (19980000), page 93 | - D. NECULAI et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), page 280 | - SCHINDLER C et al., Annu. Rev. Biochem., (19950000), page 64 | - NOVICK D et al., Cell, (19940000), page 76 | - HO AS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19930000), page 90 | - STARK et al., Annu. Rev. Biochem., (19970000), page 67 | - LEVY et al., Nat. Rev. Mol. Cell Biol., (20020000), page 3 | - ZHONG et al., Science, (19940000), page 264 | - MASUDA et al., Cancer Res., (20020000), page 62 | - BENEKLI et al., Blood, (20020000), page 99 | - YUICHI et al., Int. J. Oncology, (20070000), page 30 | - AKIRA et al., Oncogene, (20000000), page 19 | - SIDDIQUEE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20070000), page 104 | - SIDDIQUEE et al., Chem. Biol., (20070000), page 2 | - LIN et al., Neoplasia, (20100000), page 12 | - SCHUST et al., Chem. Biol., (20060000), page 13 | - SONG et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20050000), page 102 | - ZHANG et al., Biochem. Pharm., (20100000), page 79 | - MATSUNO et al., ACS Med. Chem. Lett., (20100000), page 1 | - TURKSON J et al., Mol Cancer Ther., (20040000), page 261 | - COLEMAN et al., J. Med. Chem., (20050000), page 48 |