EP4062135 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A MEANS FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER OF A DISTANT ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26, Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAZ VAQUERO, Sheila Carretera de Salcedo, n° 781 - Cenero 33393 Gijon Asturias / ES | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France Research & Development Intellectual Property 6, rue André Campra, Immeuble Le Cézanne 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 19813144.3 | 21.11.2019 | [2022/39] | WO2019IB60021 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099821 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062135 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01J1/02, G01J5/02, G01J5/04 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B05B12/18 (EP);
G01J1/0252 (EP);
G01J5/05 (EP);
G01J5/051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ EINES MITTELS ZUM MESSEN EINES PARAMETERS EINES FERNEN ELEMENTS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER VORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTING A MEANS FOR MEASURING A PARAMETER OF A DISTANT ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR UN MOYEN DE MESURE DE PARAMÈTRE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DISTANT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CE DISPOSITIF | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]GB1039955 (GLACES DE BOUSSOIS); | [A]US4836689 (O'BRIEN RICHARD J [US], et al); | [XY]US2007251663 (SHELDON WILLIAM [GB], et al); | [XY]US2008285132 (O'KANE KEVIN JAMES [US]); | [Y]WO2018122573 (ARCELORMITTAL [LU]) | by applicant | WO2018011573 |