EP3923902 - NATURAL HAIR STYLING GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOOPMANN, Nora Langenrehm 15 22081 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/51] | 01 /
KOOPMANN, Nora 22081 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 19813261.5 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/51] | WO2019EP82569 | Priority number, date | DE201910201729 | 11.02.2019 Original published format: DE102019201729 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020164769 | Date: | 20.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923902 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/60, A61K8/73, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/06 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/60 (EP);
A61K8/732 (EP);
A61Q5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | NATÜRLICHES HAARSTYLING-GEL | [2021/51] | English: | NATURAL HAIR STYLING GEL | [2021/51] | French: | GEL COIFFANT NATUREL | [2021/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102006051729 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [[0001]] , [ [0007]] , [ [0170]] , [ [0232]]; claim - *; | [Y]DE102009002267 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [[0001]] , [ [0005]] , [ [0028]] , [ [0142]]; claim - *; | [Y]WO2011048175 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 19, paragraph 5 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * page 24, paragraph 3; example - *; | [Y]DE102016203231 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [[0001]] , [ [0009]] , [ [0011]]; claim - *; | [Y] - anonymous, "Volume Boosting Shampoo", GNPD, MINTEL, (20061003), Database accession no. 595376, URL: www.gnpd.com, XP055666005 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |