EP3884265 - CAPACITIVE SENSOR FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC SPECTROSCOPY, DEVICE AND METHOD USING SUCH A SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE MONTPELLIER 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICET, Aurore 120 rue des Erables 34730 Prades-le-Lez / FR | 02 /
CHAMASSI, Kaim C302 574 avenue Adolphe Alphand 34080 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
BAHRIZ, Michaël 579 avenue Adolphe Alphand 34080 Montpellier / FR | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | IPAZ 10 boulevard Victor Hugo 34000 Montpellier / FR | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19813429.8 | 20.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019EP81911 | Priority number, date | FR20180071680 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1871680 | [2021/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020104518 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884265 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3884265 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G01N29/02, G01N29/24, B06B1/02 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
G01N29/022 (EP);
G01N29/2418 (EP);
G01N33/0047 (US);
G01N2021/1704 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | G01N21/17, B06B1/02, G01K11/02, G01N29/02, G01N29/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER SENSOR FÜR PHOTOAKUSTISCHE SPEKTROSKOPIE, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN SENSORS | [2023/41] | English: | CAPACITIVE SENSOR FOR PHOTOACOUSTIC SPECTROSCOPY, DEVICE AND METHOD USING SUCH A SENSOR | [2021/39] | French: | CAPTEUR CAPACITIF POUR LA SPECTROSCOPIE PHOTO-ACOUSTIQUE, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL CAPTEUR | [2021/39] |
Former [2021/39] | KAPAZITIVER SENSOR FÜR PHOTOAKUSTISCHE SPEKTROSKOPIE, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG SOLCH EINES SENSORS | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6344647 (JOURDAIN ANNE [FR], et al) [Y] 7 * column 1, line 48 - line 63 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 27; figure 1 *; | [IAY]US2012227498 (KANDORI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,4-6,8-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0024]; figure 3 * [A] 3[Y] 7; | [IAY]WO2017186796 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * page 1, line 19 - page 4, line 22; figures 2,3 * * page 5, line 10 - line 11 * [A] 3 [Y] 7 |