EP3898611 - SUBSTITUTED OXOPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF THROMBOTIC OR THROMBOEMBOLIC DISORDERS AND/OR THROMBOTIC OR THROMBOEMBOLIC COMPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEITMEIER, Stefan Am Wasserturm 56 42489 Wülfrath / DE | 02 /
MUNDL, Hardi Leisberg 8 69124 Heidelberg / DE | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/43] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 19813886.9 | 10.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP84449 | Priority number, date | EP20180213216 | 17.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18213216 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020126682 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898611 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/10, A61K31/4439, A61P9/10 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,KR);
A61K9/10 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE OXOPYRIDINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER PROPHYLAXE VON THROMBOTISCHEN ODER THROMBOEMBOLISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN UND/ODER THROMBOTISCHEN ODER THROMBOEMBOLISCHEN KOMPLIKATIONEN | [2021/43] | English: | SUBSTITUTED OXOPYRIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR THE TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF THROMBOTIC OR THROMBOEMBOLIC DISORDERS AND/OR THROMBOTIC OR THROMBOEMBOLIC COMPLICATIONS | [2021/43] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'OXOPYRIDINE SUBSTITUÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LA PROPHYLAXIE DE TROUBLES THROMBOTIQUES OU THROMBOEMBOLIQUES ET/OU DE COMPLICATIONS THROMBOTIQUES OU THROMBOEMBOLIQUES | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016205482 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-10* page 54, line 3 - line 29; example -; claim - *; | [XDY]WO2017005725 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE]) [XD] 1-10 * page 46, line 20 - page 47, line 30; examples 235, 242; claim - * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US2017029423 (WEI YONGGANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [[0015]]; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2017023992 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 24, line 11 - line 21; example -; claim - * | by applicant | WO2017005725 |