EP3806523 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SIGNAL, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Bo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LU, Zhaohua ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WU, Hao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Chuangxin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
YAO, Ke ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19814693.8 | 27.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019CN88577 | Priority number, date | CN201810589295 | 08.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810589295 | [2021/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019233304 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806523 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04B7/06, H04L5/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B17/336 (US);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (CN);
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0085 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN EINES SIGNALS, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM MELDEN VON KANALZUSTANDSINFORMATIONEN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENDING SIGNAL, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REPORTING CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ENVOI DE SIGNAL, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2020 | Translation filed | 28.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2013141781 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-5,7,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0021] , [0033] , [0084] * [A] 13 [I] 6,8; | [XA]US2014073313 (HAMMARWALL DAVID [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0057] , [0 58] , [0 71] , [0 72] , [0 73] , [0 80] - [0083]; figures 5,6 * [A] 3-13; | [XA]US2016308652 (SUN YING [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0 41] , [0 42] , [0 59] - [0063] *[A] 3-13 | International search | [A]GB2507570 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-61* entire document *; | [X]CN108111276 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-61 * paragraphs 72-251 *; | [A]CN108111286 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-61 * entire document * |