EP3813965 - CLIMBING-WALL AND PENDULUM-FALL, SWING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECSC Properties, LLC 340 South Main St. Coalville, UT 84017 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CYLVICK, Eric, S. 2042 West Valley Vista Drive Wanship, Utah 84107 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Cole, Paul Gilbert Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19815147.4 | 05.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US35504 | Priority number, date | US201862680909P | 05.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862680909 P | US201862757577P | 08.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862757577 P | US201962839665P | 27.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962839665 P | US201916431524 | 04.06.2019 Original published format: US201916431524 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019236659 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813965 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00, A62B35/00, A63B9/00, A63B17/00, A63B27/00, A63G9/00, A63G31/00, A63B21/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A63B9/00 (EP,US);
A63B21/4007 (EP,US);
A63B21/4009 (EP);
A63B21/4011 (EP);
A63B69/0048 (EP,US);
A63B69/0064 (EP);
A63B71/0054 (EP);
A63B71/02 (EP,US);
A63G31/00 (EP);
A63G9/00 (EP);
A63B2005/163 (EP);
A63B2009/006 (EP);
A63B21/4045 (EP);
A63B2209/02 (EP);
A63B2210/50 (EP);
A63B2220/10 (EP);
A63B2220/20 (EP);
A63B2220/50 (EP);
A63B2220/51 (EP);
A63B2220/52 (EP);
A63B2220/80 (EP);
A63B2225/09 (EP);
A63B2225/093 (EP);
A63B2225/20 (EP);
A63B2225/50 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP);
A63B7/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | A63B69/00, A62B35/00, A63B9/00, A63B17/00, A63B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | KLETTERWAND UND PENDELFALL, SCHWINGVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2021/18] | English: | CLIMBING-WALL AND PENDULUM-FALL, SWING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2021/18] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE BALANCEMENT SUR UN MUR D'ESCALADE ET LORS D'UNE CHUTE EN PENDULE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 17.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5267906 (KITCHEN WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1,6,14 * abstract *; | [A]WO9516496 (STRICKLER JAMES H [US]) [A] 1,6,14* abstract *; | [A]US7357757 (BROWN GEORGE T [US]) [A] 1,6,14 * abstract *; | [A]US2017197132 (BOWERS BRUCE [US]) [A] 1,6,14 * abstract * | International search | [XY]US2004238277 (KRUSE JOHN [US]) [X] 6 * entire document * [Y] 7, 8; | [Y]US2008185221 (POSTMA NATHAN B [US]) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document *; | [A]US2007175698 (KETRING THOMAS DALE [US]) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US4997064 (MOTTE DENIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2002046903 (STRICKLER JAMES HAMILTON [US]) [A] 1-15 * entire document * |