EP3894083 - SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSSMANN, Daniel Lange Str. 23 59302 Oelde / DE | 02 /
BATHELT, Thomas Von-Brachum-Str. 18 59302 Oelde / DE | 03 /
HERBERG, Wolf-Dietrich Durchholzer Str. 168 58456 Witten / DE | 04 /
HUNDERTMARK, Tim Adele-Bartsch-Str. 35 33334 Gütersloh / DE | 05 /
STRÖFER, Björn Herzfelder Str. 30a 59269 Beckum / DE | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19816255.4 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019EP83332 | Priority number, date | DE201810131956 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: DE102018131956 | [2021/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120203 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894083 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3894083 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/08, B04B11/02, A23L2/54 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP,KR,US);
C12H1/061 (US);
A23L2/54 (EP,KR);
B04B11/02 (EP,KR,US);
B04B11/082 (US);
C12C11/11 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | B04B1/08, B04B11/02, A23L2/54, B01F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEPARATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BETRIEB | [2021/42] | English: | SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR OPERATION THEREOF | [2021/42] | French: | SÉPARATEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]CH204938 (SEPARATOR AB [SE]); | [Y]DE678329 (RAMESOHL & SCHMIDT AG); | [X]DE696796 (RAMESOHL & SCHMIDT AG); | [X]US2230210 (OTTO BRECOUR, et al); | [YD]US9789450 (SCHULTZ PETER [US]) | by applicant | US9789450 |