EP3890710 - DELAYED RELEASE DRUG FORMULATION COMPRISING AN OUTERLAYER WITH AN ENZYMATICYALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMER, ITS COMPOSITION AND ITS METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tillotts Pharma AG Baslerstrasse 15 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARUM, Felipe c/o Tillotts Pharma AG Baslerstrasse 15 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 02 /
VON ROCHOW, Laetitia c/o Tillotts Pharma AG Baslerstrasse 15 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 03 /
FÜLLER, Carsten Markus c/o Tillotts Pharma AG Baslerstrasse 15 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | 04 /
BRAVO GONZALEZ, Roberto Carlos c/o Tillotts Pharma AG Baslerstrasse 15 4310 Rheinfelden / CH | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19816317.2 | 05.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019EP83910 | Priority number, date | EP20180211152 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18211152 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020115255 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3890710 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K9/20, A61K9/48, A61K31/606 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/2886 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/2893 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/606 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/2013 (US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2095 (US);
A61K9/2846 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/286 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2866 (KR);
A61K9/4816 (EP,IL);
A61K9/4891 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | 10.06.2021 | ME | 10.06.2021 | Validation states | MA | 10.06.2021 | MD | 10.06.2021 | TN | 10.06.2021 | Title | German: | ARZNEIFORMULIERUNG MIT VERZÖGERTER WIRKSTOFFABGABE MIT EINER AUSSENSCHICHT MIT EINEM ENZYMATISCH ABBAUBAREN POLYMER, DEREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2021/41] | English: | DELAYED RELEASE DRUG FORMULATION COMPRISING AN OUTERLAYER WITH AN ENZYMATICYALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMER, ITS COMPOSITION AND ITS METHOD OF MANUFACTURING | [2021/41] | French: | FORMULATION DE MÉDICAMENT À LIBÉRATION RETARDÉE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE EXTERNE AVEC UN POLYMÈRE DÉGRADABLE PAR VOIE ENZYMATIQUE, SA COMPOSITION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 10.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007243253 (BASIT ABDUL W [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 35-38 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0060] * * claims 1-38 *; | [A]US2009208574 (CHEN JEN-CHI [US]) [A] 1-16* claims 1-20 *; | [X]AU2012247013 (UNIV LONDON) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-37 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]EP3257501 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH]) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-16 * * examples 2,3 * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0132] * | by applicant | EP0343993 | EP0502032 | US5422121 | WO9636321 | WO9921536 | WO9925325 | WO0176562 | GB2367002 | WO03068196 | WO2004052339 | US2008200482 | WO2008135090 | WO2013164315 | - MILOJEVIC, Journal of Controlled Release, (19960000), vol. 38, pages 75 - 84 | - AKHGARI, European Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, (20060300), vol. 28, pages 307 - 314 |