EP3898027 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY USING A STIRRING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/43] | STIRRING DEVICE FOR A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY USING SUCH A STIRRING DEVICE | ||
[2022/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comptech Rheocasting i Skillingaryd AB c/o Comptech AB Box 28 568 30 Skillingaryd / SE | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states PA Invest AB Stationsgatan 4 568 30 Skillingaryd / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSON, Per Rönngatan 11 568 30 Skillinggaryd / SE | [2022/45] |
Former [2021/43] | 01 /
JANSSON, Per Rönngatan 11 568 30 SKILLINGARYD / SE | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19816473.3 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019SE51207 | Priority number, date | SE20180051648 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: SE 1851648 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130907 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898027 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3898027 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22D17/00, B22D1/00, B22D19/00, B22D27/04, B22D27/20, C22C1/00, F27D27/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B22D27/20 (EP);
F27D27/00 (EP,SE);
B22D41/62 (US);
B22D1/00 (EP);
B22D17/00 (SE);
B22D17/007 (EP);
B22D19/00 (EP);
B22D27/04 (EP);
C22C1/00 (SE);
C22C1/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | B22D1/00, B22D19/00, B22D27/04, B22D27/20, C22C1/00, F27D27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HALBFESTEN METALLAUFSCHLÄMMUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER RÜHRVORRICHTUNG | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY USING A STIRRING DEVICE | [2022/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE MÉTAL SEMI-SOLIDE A L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AGITATION | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/43] | RÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE HALBFESTE METALLAUFSCHLÄMMUNG UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HALBFESTEN METALLAUFSCHLÄMMUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN RÜHRVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/43] | STIRRING DEVICE FOR A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY AND METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRODUCING A SEMI-SOLID METAL SLURRY USING SUCH A STIRRING DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/43] | DISPOSITIF D'AGITATION POUR UNE SUSPENSION DE MÉTAL SEMI-SOLIDE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SUSPENSION DE MÉTAL SEMI-SOLIDE À L'AIDE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'AGITATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 07.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 07.09.2022 | [2022/51] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3951651 (MEHRABIAN ROBERT, et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * figure 1 * [Y] 9-14 [I] 2,4; | [XYI]JP2004204303 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1,5-8 * Machine translation, Paragraph Subject of the invention;; figures 1-5 * [Y] 9-14 [I] 2-4; | [XYI]CN103307900 (BEIJING NONFERROUS METAL) [X] 1-3,5-8 * Machine translation; Paragraph background technology;; figures 1,2 * [Y] 9-14 [I] 4; | [XYI]CN105537552 (CAO HAIPING, et al) [X] 1,5-8 * Machine translation; Paragraph Embodiment;; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9-14 [I] 2-4; | [YD]SE538596 (PA INVEST AB [SE]) [YD] 9-14* Machine translation; paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0033] * | by applicant | EP1838885 | EP1838885 | SE538596 |