EP3888427 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING AT LEAST A PART OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT, AND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macsa ID, S.A. Cl Oms i de Prat, 2 Pol. Ind. Pla de Santa Anna 08272 Sant Fruitos de Bages (Barcelona) / ES | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SESHAIYA DORAISWAMY CHANDRASEKAR, Venkatesh Kolk 13A 2611 KC Delft / NL | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Durán-Corretjer, S.L.P. Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19816575.5 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019EP83194 | Priority number, date | NL20182022106 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: NL 2022106 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020109614 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888427 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/10, H05K1/03 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
H05K3/105 (EP,US);
H05K1/0386 (EP,US);
H05K2201/012 (EP);
H05K2201/0154 (EP);
H05K2201/0323 (EP);
H05K2203/107 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG MINDESTENS EINES TEILS EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN SCHALTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNG | [2021/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CREATING AT LEAST A PART OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT, AND ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT | [2021/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CRÉATION D'AU MOINS UNE PARTIE D'UN CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 24.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]CN108007480 (UNIV SUZHOU) [X] 1,16-19,21-26,30,31 * claims 1,5 * * paragraphs [0019] , [0029] , [0053] - [0054] * * figures 3,7 * [A] 27,28 [Y] 4-15 [I] 2,3,20,29; | [X]US2010155107 (LANGEREIS GEERT [NL], et al) [X] 1,27,28,30,31 * claims 1,6,7 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0029] * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]US2010062220 (NISHIKAWA YASUSHI [JP]) [Y] 4-15 * claims 1,10-14,16,18 * * paragraphs [0176] , [0177] , [0182] , [0188] , [0232] * |