EP3891119 - NEW PRILLS OF HYDROQUINONE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECIALTY OPERATIONS FRANCE 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states RHODIA OPERATIONS 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52 Rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAPEY-TRIOMPHE, Rodolphe 32 route de Ternay 69360 Sérézin-du-Rhône / FR | 02 /
FISCHER, Lars 15b, Chemin de Collonge 38200 Vienne / FR | 03 /
VANZIN, David 321 Bridgeway Drive Franklin, Tennessee 37064 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Melmoux, Florent Spécialty Opérations France RICL, B215 85, avenue des Frères Perret 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Jacques, Marie-Caroline Anne RHODIA OPERATIONS (Solvay Group) Intellectual Assets Management 85 rue des Frères Perret RICL, BP62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19816625.8 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019EP83557 | Priority number, date | US201862774513P | 03.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862774513 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020115078 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3891119 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/70, C07C39/08, B01J2/06 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
C07C37/70 (EP);
B01J2/20 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/70, C07C39/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | NEUE PRILLS VON HYDROCHINON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/41] | English: | NEW PRILLS OF HYDROQUINONE AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING THE SAME | [2021/41] | French: | NOUVELLES GRANULES D'HYDROQUINONE ET PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION CORRESPONDANT | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 05.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US7235299 (LE THIESSE JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]); | [XDI]WO2018153913 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR]); | [XPI]DE202018005859U (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR]) | by applicant | JP2000302716 | WO0170869 | WO2004039758 | WO2008000955 | WO2008000956 | WO2008000954 | WO2016033157 | WO2018153913 |