EP3883490 - CONFIGURING PERIMETER OF BALLOON ELECTRODE AS LOCATION SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2022/24] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel), Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yoknaem / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAR-TAL, Meir C/o Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufah Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19816882.5 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019IB59657 | Priority number, date | US201816198487 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: US201816198487 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020104886 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3883490 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B18/14 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,IL,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/00557 (EP,IL);
A61B2018/00077 (IL,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00351 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00375 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2018/00773 (IL,US);
A61B2018/00839 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | KONFIGURIERUNG DES UMFANGS EINER BALLONELEKTRODE ALS STANDORTSENSOR | [2021/39] | English: | CONFIGURING PERIMETER OF BALLOON ELECTRODE AS LOCATION SENSOR | [2021/39] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE PÉRIMÈTRE D'ÉLECTRODE À BALLONNET EN TANT QUE CAPTEUR D'EMPLACEMENT | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 01.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO0010456 (SUPER DIMENSION LTD [IL], et al); | [Y]EP1820464 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]); | [Y]EP2875790 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]); | [L]WO2018220479 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) | by applicant | US5391199 | WO9605768 | US6239724 | US6332089 | US2002065455 | US2002087156 | US6484118 | US6574492 | US2003120150 | US6618612 | US6690963 | US2004068178 | US2014364848 |