EP3911157 - SOLUTION FOR PRESERVING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES AND USE OF SUCH SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaltek S.r.l. Via Liguria 29 35020 Saonara (PD) / IT | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/47] | For all designated states Kaltek S.r.l. Via del Progresso, 2 35127 Padova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORTELAZZO, Lorenzo VIA S. DE CETTO N. 9 35133 PADOVA / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
CORTELAZZO, Lorenzo 35133 PADOVA / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 19817164.7 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019EP82465 | Priority number, date | IT20190000661 | 16.01.2019 Original published format: IT201900000661 | [2021/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020148007 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911157 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/00, A01N35/00 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A01N1/00 (EP,US);
A01N35/00 (EP);
A01N35/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | LÖSUNG ZUR KONSERVIERUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN UND VERWENDUNG SOLCH EINER LÖSUNG | [2021/47] | English: | SOLUTION FOR PRESERVING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES AND USE OF SUCH SOLUTION | [2021/47] | French: | SOLUTION DE CONSERVATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE SOLUTION | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 04.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2025226 (CADEC S L N E [ES]) [X] 1,5-10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010]; claims 1-6 * [Y] 2-4; | [XY]ES2137852 (UNIV MADRID COMPLUTENSE [ES]) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * example 22 * [Y] 2,4,9,10; | [XY]EP0775439 (UNIV MADRID COMPLUTENSE [ES]) [X] 1,5-10 * claims 1, 17-20, 39 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]WO9407532 (STRECK LAB [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,7-10 * claims 1-101 *; | [Y]JP2006256973 (KANKYO KEIKAKU KK, et al) [Y] 2-4,7-10 * paragraph [0019]; claims 1-5 *; | [A] - THOMAS R. WEBER ET AL, "Viable vein graft preservation", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH., US, (19750301), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0022-4804(75)90148-1, ISSN 0022-4804, pages 247 - 255, XP055596285 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-4804(75)90148-1 | by applicant | IT20190000661 |