EP3877690 - TOOL WITH MOTORIZED ROLLERS, FOR INTERVENTION ON THE WALL OF A FLUID CONDUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/37] | TOOL WITH MOTORIZED ROLLERS, FOR INTERVENTION ON THE WALL OF A FLUID PIPE | ||
[2023/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRTgaz 6, rue Raoul Nordling 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKER, Benoit 272 avenue des Églantiers 59910 BONDUES / FR | 02 /
FERNANDEZ, Charles 13 Ter Boulevard Ennemond Richard 42400 SAINT-CHAMOND / FR | 03 /
BONNAUDET, Melissandre 31 rue d'Yerres 91230 MONGERON / FR | 04 /
LECCHI, Maxime 2 allée des Lilas 78500 SARTROUVILLE / FR | 05 /
COURTALON, Eric 73 rue de Paris 60200 COMPIEGNE / FR | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19817393.2 | 06.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019FR52626 | Priority number, date | FR20180060216 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1860216 | [2021/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094975 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877690 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3877690 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/48, F16L55/32, F16L55/38, F16L55/40, F16L55/128, B60L7/00, F16L55/18, F16L55/44, B60L53/00, G01C21/00, G01L19/00, F16L101/30, F16L101/60, B23K37/02, B60L7/10, B60L50/30, B60L50/60, B60L50/90, // B23K101/06, B23K101/10 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
F16L55/38 (EP);
F16L55/32 (EP,US);
B23K37/0276 (EP);
B23K37/0282 (EP);
B23K37/0294 (EP);
B60L50/30 (EP);
B60L50/60 (EP);
B60L50/90 (EP);
B60L7/10 (EP);
F16L55/18 (EP);
F16L55/40 (EP);
F16L55/44 (EP);
F16L55/48 (EP,US);
G05D1/0259 (US);
G05D1/0272 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
B23K2101/06 (EP);
B23K2101/10 (EP);
F16L2101/30 (EP,US);
F16L2101/60 (EP);
F16L55/1283 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | F16L55/48, F16L55/32, F16L55/38, F16L55/40, F16L55/128, B60L7/00, F16L55/18, F16L55/44, B60L53/00, G01C21/00, G01L19/00, F16L101/30, F16L101/60, B23K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG MIT MOTORISIERTEN ROLLEN ZUR INTERVENTION AN DER WAND EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSLEITUNG | [2023/13] | English: | TOOL WITH MOTORIZED ROLLERS, FOR INTERVENTION ON THE WALL OF A FLUID CONDUIT | [2023/11] | French: | OUTIL POUR INTERVENTION SUR LA PAROI D'UNE CANALISATION DE FLUIDE AVEC GALETS MOTORISES | [2021/37] |
Former [2021/37] | WERKZEUG MIT MOTORISIERTEN ROLLEN ZUR INTERVENTION AN DER WAND EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSROHRS | ||
Former [2021/37] | TOOL WITH MOTORIZED ROLLERS, FOR INTERVENTION ON THE WALL OF A FLUID PIPE | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 04.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | LU | 06.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 06.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4413655 (BROWN GEORGE T [US]) [A] 21,24* column 5, line 23 - line 63; figure - *; | [A]WO8601751 (STORESUND PER) [A] 4 * page 6; figure - *; | [XAI]US6752175 (WILLSCHUETZ KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,12,17,20,21,26,29 * column 6, line 27 - line 65; figure - * * column 7, line 21 - line 58 * * column 4, line 22 - line 32 * * column 8, line 9 - line 26 * [A] 10 [I] 2-4,19,22,25; | [A]US2005223825 (JANSSEN THEO [DE]) [A] 18,19 * paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [ID]WO2007141554 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US], et al) [ID] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0035]; figure - *; | [IDA]FR3016952 (GDF SUEZ [FR]) [ID] 1-9,11-18,20-25,27-29 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 2 * * page 4, line 9 - line 12; claim 20 * [A] 10 | by applicant | WO03067134 | WO2007141554 | FR3016952 |