EP3928515 - COMPRESSION ACROSS MULTIPLE IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMASWAMY, Sharadh 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
RAMASWAMY, Sharadh Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 19817453.4 | 10.11.2019 | [2021/52] | WO2019US60664 | Priority number, date | US201916282418 | 22.02.2019 Original published format: US201916282418 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020171860 | Date: | 27.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3928515 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/13, H03M7/46, H04M1/725, H04N1/00, H04N19/136, H04N19/177, H04N19/42, H04N19/91, H04N19/93 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
H04N19/13 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/542 (KR,US);
H03M7/3059 (EP,KR);
H03M7/40 (EP,KR);
H03M7/42 (EP,KR);
H04N19/124 (KR,US);
H04N19/136 (EP,KR);
H04N19/176 (US);
H04N19/177 (EP,KR);
H04N19/42 (EP,KR);
H04N19/625 (KR,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,KR);
H04N19/93 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSION ÜBER MEHRERE BILDER | [2021/52] | English: | COMPRESSION ACROSS MULTIPLE IMAGES | [2021/52] | French: | COMPRESSION DE MULTIPLES IMAGES | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002087546 (SLATER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] *; | [A]EP1513080 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0003] *; | [A]US2007208826 (DEVOLITES JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] *; | [A]JP2011205521 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2018152709 (LAY THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0044]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0061]; figures 6-7 *; | [XI] - Ralf Steinmetz ET AL, "Data Compression", Multimedia Fundamentals, Volume 1: Media Coding and Content Processing, Prentice Hall, (20020116), pages 105 - 168, ISBN 0130313998, XP055204896 [X] 1-6,13-18 * sections 7.4.7, 7.5.0.2, 7.5.2 * [I] 7-12,19-24 | [XI] - "JPEG", INTERNET CITATION, (20140124), pages 1 - 30, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/JPEG, (20140127), XP002719259 [X] 1-6,13-18 * page 11 - page 17 * [I] 7-12,19-24 | [XI] - JEON B ET AL, "APPLICATION OF DYNAMIC HUFFMAN CODING TO IMAGE SEQUENCE COMPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE/ IS & T,, (19940925), vol. 2308, doi:10.1117/12.185919, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 1636 - 1647, XP009049118 [X] 1-6,13-18 * setion I * [I] 7-12,19-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.185919 | [A] - WALLACE G K, "THE JPEG STILL PICTURE COMPRESSION STANDARD", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19920201), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1109/30.125072, ISSN 0098-3063, pages XVIII - XXXIV, XP000297354 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.125072 |