EP3880766 - SOLVENTLESS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USE IN FORMING A LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 400 Arcola Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Yinzhong 230 Abner Jackson Parkway Lake Jackson TX 77566 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Mai 1500 E. Lake Cook Rd. Buffalo Grove IL 60089 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19817485.6 | 13.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US61249 | Priority number, date | US201862768281P | 16.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862768281 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102402 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880766 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3880766 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, C08G18/10, C08G18/50, C08G18/48, C08G18/46, C08G18/42, C08G18/40, C08G18/38, B32B27/40, C08G18/72, C08G18/79, C08G18/76, B32B27/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/36 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C09J175/04 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/40 (US);
C08G18/3885 (EP,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/42 (EP,US);
C08G18/4615 (EP);
C08G18/48 (EP);
C08G18/5045 (EP,US);
C08G18/5084 (EP);
C08G18/725 (EP);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/797 (EP);
C08J5/128 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | C09J175/04, C08G18/76, C08G18/79, C08G18/72, B32B27/40, C08G18/38, C08G18/40, C08G18/42, C08G18/46, C08G18/48, C08G18/50, C08G18/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIER KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVEFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG ZUR LAMINATHERSTELLUNG | [2023/10] | English: | SOLVENTLESS ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USE IN FORMING A LAMINATE | [2021/38] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ADHÉSIF SANS SOLVENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON UTILSATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE STRATIFIÉS | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/38] | LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG IN DER FORMUNG EINES LAMINATS | ||
Former [2021/38] | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE SANS SOLVANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DANS LA FORMATION D'UN STRATIFIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 28.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | LU | 13.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
LU | 13.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2015168670 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al); | [A]WO2018049672 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al); | [A]EP3327056 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) | by applicant | WO2015168670 |