EP3917585 - ELECTROSPUN COVER LAYER FOR MEDICAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xeltis AG Seefeldstrasse 69 8008 Zurich / CH | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPES, Susana Amorim Oberhauserstrasse 12 Glattbrugg 8152 Zurich / CH | 02 /
VAN DER BURGT, Vivian Henriettestraat 5 5616 PE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BAELUS, Betty Bloemfonteinstraat 19 5642 EC Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
COX, Martijn Antonius Johannes Fabrieksstraat 31 6021 RC Budel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
LOPES, Susana Amorim 8152 Zurich / CH | ||
02 /
VAN DER BURGT, Vivian 5616 PE Eindhoven / NL | |||
03 /
BAELUS, Betty 5642 EC Eindhoven / NL | |||
04 /
COX, Martijn Antonius Johannes 6021 RC Budel / NL | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19817665.3 | 09.12.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019EP84147 | Priority number, date | US201962798227P | 29.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962798227 P | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156711 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3917585 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/16, A61L27/34, A61L27/50, A61L27/56 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
A61L27/507 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP);
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (US);
A61L2420/08 (EP);
A61L2430/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L27/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTROGESPONNENE DECKSCHICHT FÜR MEDIZINISCHE IMPLANTATE | [2021/49] | English: | ELECTROSPUN COVER LAYER FOR MEDICAL IMPLANTS | [2021/49] | French: | COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT ÉLECTROFILÉE POUR IMPLANTS MÉDICAUX | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2022 | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.06.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013268062 (PUCKETT SABRINA D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * claim 1 * * pages 16-17; examples 4-6 * * paragraph [0008] * * figure 4 *; | [X]US2016317295 (JANA SOUMEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,11 * claims 1, 2 * * pages 5-9; example 1 *; | [X]US2017340460 (ROSEN LIOR [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * claim 1 * * pages 4-5, paragraph 0043 - paragraph 0047 * * page 7, paragraph 0062 *; | [XI]EP2968674 (GORE & ASS [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * claim 1 * * pages 14-15; example 4 * * figures 24-27 *[I] 4,7,12-14 | by applicant | - SIJBESMA, Science, (19970000), vol. 278, pages 1601 - 1604 |