EP3861887 - FOREIGN MATTER INTRUSION PREVENTING IMPLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tojo, Takako 1-108-8 Takeoka Kagoshima-shi Kagoshima 890-0031 / JP | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tojo, Takako Kagoshima 890-0031 / JP | 02 /
Tojo, Harumi Kagoshima 890-0031 / JP | [2023/50] |
Former [2021/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Rösler Rasch van der Heide & Partner Bodenseestraße 18 81241 München / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19817924.4 | 01.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019JP38763 | Priority number, date | JP20180188018 | 03.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018188018 | JP20180231141 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018231141 | [2021/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020071369 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861887 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A45D44/08 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
A45D44/08 (EP,US);
A44B18/008 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES EINDRINGENS VON FREMDSTOFFEN | [2021/32] | English: | FOREIGN MATTER INTRUSION PREVENTING IMPLEMENT | [2021/32] | French: | MOYEN DE PRÉVENTION D'INTRUSION DE MATIÈRES ÉTRANGÈRES | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/32] | INSTRUMENT DE PRÉVENTION D'INTRUSION DE MATIÈRES ÉTRANGÈRES | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2019 | Translation filed | 20.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2019 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015208787 (MATSUDA KEN ICHI [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0061]; figures 2-8 *; | [XAI]GB2549620 (ZHIK PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0026] , [0028] - [0030] - [0032] , [0034] , [0038] , [0039] , [0046]; figures 1-8 * [A] 9,10 [I] 5,6 | International search | [A]JPS623582U ; | [YA]JP2000041735 (WAKO IRYO KK); | [YA]JP2006247300 (SATO EIICHI); | [A]JP2015159941 (MIYAMOTO YASUNAGA, et al) | by applicant | JPH08242942 |