EP3899282 - DISPLACEMENT ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM FOR A VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vhit S.P.A. Societa Unipersonale Strada vicinale delle Sabbione 5 26010 Offanengo / IT | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Vhit S.P.A. Societa Unipersonale Strada vicinale delle Sabbione 5 26010 Offanengo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLI, Giancarlo Strada Vicinale della Sabbiona, 5 26010 Offanengo / IT | 02 /
CROSIO, Pietro Francesco Via Trento 54 27049 Stradella / IT | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/43] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Wernerstrasse 51 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 19818191.9 | 18.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP85961 | Priority number, date | IT20180020377 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: IT201800020377 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020127491 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899282 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3899282 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F04C14/22 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
F04C14/226 (EP);
F04C2/3441 (EP);
F04C28/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERDRÄNGUNGSEINSTELLUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE VARIABLE VERDRÄNGERPUMPE | [2021/43] | English: | DISPLACEMENT ADJUSTMENT SYSTEM FOR A VARIABLE DISPLACEMENT PUMP | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AJUSTEMENT DE DÉBIT POUR POMPE À DÉBIT VARIABLE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10234621 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]); | [XI]WO2012113437 (PIERBURG PUMP TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al); | [XI]US2013209302 (ONO HISASHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2015160178 |