EP3794456 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTONOMOUS HARDWARE COMPUTE RESILIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lucid Circuit, Inc. 1639 11th St. Suite 120 Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKA, Michel, D. 1639 11th St. Suite 120 Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19818858.3 | 08.06.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019US36190 | Priority number, date | US201862683497P | 11.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862683497 P | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019241084 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794456 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L9/32, G06N5/04, G06N20/10 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
H04L9/3278 (EP,US);
G06F1/3293 (US);
G06F1/206 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N20/10 (EP);
G06N5/04 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (US);
Y02D10/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | G06F15/173, G06F15/177, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR AUTONOME HARDWARE-BERECHNUNGSROBUSTHEIT | [2021/12] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTONOMOUS HARDWARE COMPUTE RESILIENCY | [2021/12] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉSILIENCE DE CALCUL DE MATÉRIEL AUTONOME | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014298295 (OVERBECK CHARLES R [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0097] ** figures 1-7 *; | [Y]WO2017196821 (STRONG FORCE IOT PORTFOLIO 2016 LLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0303] * * figures 1-17 * | International search | [A]US2006155840 (GIFFIN GREGORY [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2011087887 (LUFT ACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2014173060 (JUBRAN MARWAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2015026451 (DOERR MICHAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2017206113 (KRIG SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A] - ITURBE et al., "Towards a generic and adaptive System-on-Chip controller for space exploration instrumentation", 2015 NASA/ESA Conference on Adaptive Hardware and Systems (AHS, (20150618), URL: https://trs.jpl.nasa.gov/bitstream/handle/2014/45731/15-2124-Alb.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20190809), XP033214115 [A] 1-22 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/AHS.2015.7231151 | by applicant | US20050162753 |