EP3807667 - MRI PHANTOM HAVING FILAMENTS OF INTEGRAL TEXTILE AXON SIMULATIONS AND ANISOTROPIC HOMOGENEITY MRI PHANTOM USING THE FILAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Psychology Software Tools, Inc. 311 23rd St. Ext. Suite 200 Sharpsburg, PA 15215-2821 / US | For all designated states University of Pittsburgh - Of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education 200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCCOLOTTO, Anthony, P. 114 Settlers Court Freeport, PA 16229 / US | 02 /
DZIKIY, John 5824 Pierce Street Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US | 03 /
BASLER, Leroy, K. 1167 Paintertown Road Irwin, PA 15642 / US | 04 /
RODACK, Benjamin 117 Merwood Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15214 / US | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Walter 511 Bevington Road Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | 06 /
PATHAK, Sudhir, K. 3939 O'Hara Street Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/36] | 01 /
ZUCCOLOTTO, Anthony, P. 114 Settlers Court Freeport, PA 16229 / US | ||
02 /
DZIKIY, John 5824 Pierce Street Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US | |||
03 /
BASLER, Leroy, K. 1167 Paintertown Road Irwin, PA 15642 / US | |||
04 /
RODAK, Benjamin 117 Merwood Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15214 / US | |||
05 /
SCHNEIDER, Walter 511 Bevington Road Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | |||
06 /
PATHAK, Sudhir, K. 3939 O'Hara Street Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | |||
Former [2021/16] | 01 /
ZUCCOLOTTO, Anthony, P. 114 Settlers Court Freeport, PA 16229 / US | ||
02 /
DZIKIY, John 5824 Pierce Street Pittsburgh, PA 15232 / US | |||
03 /
BASLER, Leroy, K. 1167 Paintertown Road Irwin, PA 15642 / US | |||
04 /
RODAK, Benjamin, A. 117 Merwood Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15214 / US | |||
05 /
SCHNEIDER, Walter 511 Bevington Road Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | |||
06 /
PATHAK, Suhir, K. 3939 O'Hara Street Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US | Representative(s) | Cameron Intellectual Property Ltd Moncrieff House 69 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2QB / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 19819159.5 | 17.06.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019US37525 | Priority number, date | US201862685994P | 16.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862685994 P | US201962846223P | 10.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962846223 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019241792 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3807667 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/58, G01R33/563 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G01R33/58 (EP,US);
G01R33/4804 (US);
G01R33/56341 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | G01R33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | MRI-PHANTOM MIT FILAMENTEN AUS INTEGRALEN TEXTILEN AXONSIMULATIONEN UND MRI-PHANTOM MIT ANISOTROPER HOMOGENITÄT UNTER VERWENDUNG DER FILAMENTE | [2021/16] | English: | MRI PHANTOM HAVING FILAMENTS OF INTEGRAL TEXTILE AXON SIMULATIONS AND ANISOTROPIC HOMOGENEITY MRI PHANTOM USING THE FILAMENTS | [2021/16] | French: | FANTÔME D'IRM AYANT DES FILAMENTS DE SIMULATIONS D'AXONE TEXTILE INTÉGRÉS ET FANTÔME D'IRM À HOMOGÉNÉITÉ ANISOTROPE UTILISANT LES FILAMENTS | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 24.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2017184696 (ZUCCOLOTTO ANTHONY P [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2006195030 (OGREZEANU GEORGE [DE], et al)[A] 1-20; | [AD]WO2016007939 (PSYCHOLOGY SOFTWARE TOOLS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-20; | [A]WO2017075690 (AIM INNOVATIONS INC [CA]) [A] 1-20 | by applicant | US2017 | US18696 | US6409515 | US6720766 | US6744039 | US2006165308 | US2006195030 | US2006269107 | US2007124117 | US7521931 | US7529397 | US7667458 | US8076937 | US8134363 | US2012068699 | US2013113481 | US2013279772 | US8593142 | US8643369 | WO2016007939 | US2016363644 | US2017018696 | US9603546 | WO2017075690 | US2017184696 | US2017242090 | US2017336490 | US2018161599 | US2018252790 | US10078124 | US10172587 | US10180483 | US2019033419 | US10261161 | US10274570 | - Siemens Medical Solutions, Johns Hopkins University's |