EP3715507 - ANODE FOR ELEKTROLYSIS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/40] | ELECTROLYTIC ANODE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2023/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Hun Min LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jung Ho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, In Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Kwang Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
BANG, Jung Up LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Dong Chul LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
HWANG, Gyo Hyun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 19819751.9 | 04.06.2019 | [2020/40] | WO2019KR06754 | Priority number, date | KR20180067656 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: KR 20180067656 | [2020/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019240421 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715507 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715507 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/26, C25B1/34, C25B11/04, C25B11/091 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
C25B1/34 (EP,KR,US);
C25B11/093 (KR);
C25B11/075 (US);
B05D1/04 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/00 (EP);
B05D3/002 (KR,US);
B05D3/0254 (US);
B05D3/10 (EP,US);
B05D3/102 (KR,US);
B05D3/12 (EP,KR);
B05D7/14 (EP,KR);
C25B1/26 (EP,KR);
C25B11/04 (EP);
C25B11/051 (US);
C25B11/053 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/40] | C25B11/04, C25B1/26, C25B1/34, B05D1/04, B05D7/14, B05D3/00, B05D3/10, B05D3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHE ANODE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/40] | English: | ANODE FOR ELEKTROLYSIS AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2023/02] | French: | ANODE ÉLECTROLYTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/40] | ELECTROLYTIC ANODE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | Translation filed | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2023 | CZ | 24.05.2023 | DK | 24.05.2023 | EE | 24.05.2023 | ES | 24.05.2023 | FI | 24.05.2023 | HR | 24.05.2023 | IT | 24.05.2023 | LT | 24.05.2023 | LV | 24.05.2023 | MC | 24.05.2023 | NL | 24.05.2023 | PL | 24.05.2023 | RO | 24.05.2023 | RS | 24.05.2023 | SE | 24.05.2023 | SI | 24.05.2023 | SK | 24.05.2023 | SM | 24.05.2023 | IE | 04.06.2023 | LU | 04.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 24.08.2023 | GR | 25.08.2023 | IS | 24.09.2023 | PT | 25.09.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SI | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 04.06.2023 | ||
LU | 04.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 04.06.2023 | ||
LU | 04.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.06.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
MC | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
CZ | 24.05.2023 | ||
DK | 24.05.2023 | ||
EE | 24.05.2023 | ||
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RO | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
SK | 24.05.2023 | ||
SM | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
FI | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
LT | 24.05.2023 | ||
LV | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
HR | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
RS | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
PL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
GR | 25.08.2023 | ||
IS | 24.09.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 24.05.2023 | |
ES | 24.05.2023 | ||
NL | 24.05.2023 | ||
SE | 24.05.2023 | ||
NO | 24.08.2023 | ||
PT | 25.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 24.05.2023 | |
PT | 25.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004188247 (HARDEE KENNETH L [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,7-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0037]; example 1; claims 1-39; tables 1, 1 * [A] 4,6,11; | [A]EP1841901 (INDUSTRIE DE NORA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-11* example 1; tables 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2013186750 (URGEGHE CHRISTIAN [IT], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,7-10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0 31]; example 4 *; | [A]US2013334037 (HANEDA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0088]; example 1; table 1 * | International search | [A]US3711385 (BEER H) [A] 1-11 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]US4495048 (MURAKAMI KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]KR20050111614 (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11 * See paragraph [0014]; example 1; table 1, sample F; and claims 1-5, 7-9, 14-21, 38. *; | [Y]KR20070099667 (INDUSTRIE DE NORA SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * See paragraph [0036]; example 1; table 1, sample E: and claims 1, 3, 9, 14. *; | [A]KR20170075528 (HEE SUNG METAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR20110094055 |