EP3809362 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Yutaka c/o Intellectual Property Center OMRON CORPORATION 9 chome - 1, Kizugawadai Kizugawa-shi Kyoto 619-0283 / JP | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19820259.0 | 22.05.2019 | [2021/16] | WO2019JP20287 | Priority number, date | JP20180112148 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018112148 | [2021/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019239831 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809362 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G01J3/46, G01N21/25, H04N1/60, // H04N1/54 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H04N1/60 (EP,US);
G06F18/2431 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
H04N1/54 (EP,US);
H04N1/603 (EP,US);
H04N23/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/16] | G06T1/00, G01J3/46, G01N21/25, H04N1/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDSENSOR | [2021/16] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE SENSOR | [2021/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE AINSI QUE CAPTEUR D'IMAGE | [2021/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | Translation filed | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010118047 (AJITO TAKEYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-8,13-17,19 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0087] *; | [IY]US2014233857 (ROBINSON IAN S [US]) [I] 1-3,6,16,17,19 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * [Y] 1-3,6-8,13-17,19; | [A] - LAN YANXIANG ET AL, "Interactive chromaticity mapping for multispectral images", VISUAL COMPUTER, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, vol. 29, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S00371-013-0829-X, ISSN 0178-2789, (20130504), pages 773 - 783, (20130504), XP035366234 [A] 1-8,13-17,19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00371-013-0829-x | International search | [A]JP2002262305 (CANON KK) [A] 1-19* , paragraph [0080], fig. 6, 14 *; | [XA]JP2009105576 (CANON KK) [X] 1-3, 13-17, 19 * , paragraphs [0017]-[0019], [0043], [0044], fig. 1, 3, 14, 15 * [A] 4-12, 18; | [XA]JP2012044519 (OLYMPUS CORP) [X] 1-3, 13-14, 16-17, 19 * , paragraphs [0025], [0045], [0089]-[0096], fig. 2, 6 * [A] 4-12, 15, 18; | [XA]WO2016152900 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1, 9, 10, 13- 19 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0048], [0057]-[0087], [0125]-[0138], [0150], [0151], fig. 1, 2, 22-24 (Family: none) * [A] 2-8, 11, 12 | by applicant | JP2018009988 |