EP3866586 - A MILKING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waikato Milking Systems Limited Partnership 29 Innovation Way Horotiu, Hamilton, 3288 / NZ | [2022/36] |
Former [2021/34] | For all designated states Waikato Milking LP 29 Innovation Way Horotiu, Hamilton 3288 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDOUGAL, Graeme 232 Crawford Road Te Kowhai, Hamilton, 3288 / NZ | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Gallego Jiménez, José Fernando Ingenias Creaciones, Signos e Invenciones S.L.P. Avda. Diagonal 514, 1º 4ª 08006 Barcelona / ES | [2022/40] |
Former [2021/34] | Gallego Jiménez, José Fernando Ingenias Creaciones, Signos e Invenciones S.L.P. Avda. Diagonal 514, 1º 4ª 08006 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 19820473.7 | 12.08.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019NZ50096 | Priority number, date | NZ20080187434 | 12.06.2018 Original published format: NZ 18743408 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019240598 | Date: | 19.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866586 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3866586 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/12, F16C19/30, F16C33/36, F16C33/52, F16C33/58, F16C43/06, // F16C33/50 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A01K1/126 (EP,AU,GB,US);
B60S13/02 (US);
B61J1/00 (US);
B65G13/02 (US);
B65G47/28 (US);
F16C13/006 (AU);
F16C19/305 (EP,GB);
F16C19/507 (AU);
F16C33/36 (EP);
F16C33/502 (EP,GB);
F16C33/526 (EP);
F16C33/585 (EP);
F16C43/06 (EP);
F16C2208/12 (EP);
F16C2208/60 (EP);
F16C2237/00 (GB);
F16C2300/14 (EP,GB);
F16C2310/00 (EP,AU);
F16C27/04 (AU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | A01K1/12, // F16C33/50 | ||
Former IPC [2021/34] | A01K1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MELKPLATTFORM | [2021/34] | English: | A MILKING PLATFORM | [2021/34] | French: | PLATEFORME DE TRAITE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 06.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NO | 05.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]GB1459399 (SIMPLEX CAMBRIDGE); | [A]AU671483B (JOHN MURRAY BOWERS, et al); | [A]US2015260224 (STROM MIKAEL [SE]); | [A]US2016278340 (COURTEMANCHE ALAIN [CA]) [A] 1-12 * figs 1-5,9-10 * |