EP3884036 - MODIFIED STRAINS OF CHLORELLA VULGARIS AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algenuity Holdings Ltd Eden Laboratory Broadmead Road Stewartby, Beford MK43 9ND / GB | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPICER, Andrew Eden Laboratory Broadmead Road Stewartby Bedfordshire MK439ND / GB | 02 /
SCHIANO DI VISCONTE, Gino Eden Laboratory Broadmead Road Stewartby Bedfordshire MK439ND / GB | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Lenden, Philip Simplify IP Ltd 19 Kendal Way Cambridge CB4 1LP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Basck Ltd WeWork 50-60 Station Rd Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 19821274.8 | 21.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019IB60048 | Priority number, date | GB20180018986 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: GB 201818986 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020105001 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884036 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/12 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
A21D2/267 (EP,US);
C12N1/12 (EP,GB,US);
A23L29/065 (EP,GB,US);
A23L33/00 (GB);
A23L33/135 (EP,US);
A61K8/9706 (GB);
C12N15/01 (GB);
C12N15/102 (GB,US);
A23V2002/00 (GB);
A23V2200/126 (GB)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE STÄMME VON CHLORELLA VULGARIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2021/39] | English: | MODIFIED STRAINS OF CHLORELLA VULGARIS AND METHOD OF PRODUCTION | [2021/39] | French: | SOUCHES MODIFIÉES DE CHLORELLA VULGARIS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Observations by third parties | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2010297296 (BROOKS GEOFFREY [US], et al) [Y] 1-38 * paragraphs [0009] - [0017] - [ 100]; claims 1-41 *; | [Y]EP3228359 (INFINITEC ACTIVOS S L [ES]) [Y] 1-38* paragraph [0001]; claims 1-15 *; | [Y] - SHIN WON-SUB ET AL, "Truncated light-harvesting chlorophyll antenna size inChlorella vulgarisimproves biomass productivity", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYCOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S10811-016-0874-8, ISSN 0921-8971, (20160528), pages 3193 - 3202, (20160528), XP036116965 [Y] 1-38 * Abstract;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10811-016-0874-8 | [Y] - WON-SUB SHIN ET AL, "Complementation of a mutation in CpSRP43 causing partial truncation of light-harvesting chlorophyll antenna in Chlorella vulgaris", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20171220), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-18221-0, pages 1 - 11, XP055662518 [Y] 1-38 * Abstract;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-18221-0 |