EP3809838 - GENETICALLY MODIFIED MOUSE MODELS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Jackson Laboratory 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | For all designated states Indiana University Research & Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | For all designated states Sage Bionetworks 2901 Third Avenue Suite 330 Seattle WA 98121 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWELL, Gareth 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 02 /
CARTER, Gregory 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 03 /
SASNER, Michael 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 04 /
RIZZO, Stacey 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Harriet 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, ME 04609 / US | 06 /
LAMB, Bruce 10487 Windermere Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 07 /
TERRITO, Paul 12011 Castlestone Dr. Fishers, IN 46037 / US | 08 /
OBLAK, Adrian 11847 Floral Hall Pl. Fishers, IN 46037 / US | 09 /
LOGSDON, Ben 2901 Third Avenue, Suite 330 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 10 /
MANGRAVITE, Lara 2901 Third Avenue, Suite 330 Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 11 /
GRAHAM, Leah 600 Main Street Bar Harbor, Maine 04609 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19821744.0 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US38401 | Priority number, date | US201862687952P | 21.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862687952 P | US201862700004P | 18.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700004 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019246483 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809838 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N9/16, C12N9/06, C07K14/705, C07K14/47, C07K14/775, C12N15/09 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
A01K67/0278 (US);
A01K67/0275 (EP);
A61K49/0008 (US);
C07K14/4711 (EP);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C07K14/70503 (EP,US);
C12N9/0028 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12Y105/0102 (EP,US);
C12Y301/04011 (EP,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | A01K67/027, C07K14/775, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | GENETISCH MODIFIZIERTE MAUSMODELLE DER ALZHEIMER-KRANKHEIT | [2021/17] | English: | GENETICALLY MODIFIED MOUSE MODELS OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE | [2021/17] | French: | MODÈLES DE SOURIS GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉE DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2022 | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006272038 (DE VIVO MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,5,16 * example 1 *; | [Y] - PAUL J. CHENG-HATHAWAY ET AL, "The Trem2 R47H variant confers loss-of-function-like phenotypes in Alzheimer's disease", MOLECULAR NEURODEGENERATION, (20180601), vol. 13, no. 29, doi:10.1186/s13024-018-0262-8, pages 1 - 12, XP055664658 [Y] 1-16 * Cited in the ISR; page 8 - page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13024-018-0262-8 | [Y] - MURRAY C. E. ET AL, "APOE [epsilon] 4 is also required in TREM2 R47H variant carriers for Alzheimer's disease to develop", NEUROPATHOLOGY AND APPLIED NEUROBIOLOGY., GB, vol. 45, no. 2, doi:10.1111/nan.12474, ISSN 0305-1846, (20180207), pages 183 - 186, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1111%2Fnan.12474, XP055890399 [Y] 1-16 * page 185 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/nan.12474 | [Y] - CHAN ELIZABETH S. ET AL, "ApoE4 expression accelerates hippocampus-dependent cognitive deficits by enhancing A[beta] impairment of insulin signaling in an Alzheimer's disease mouse model", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep26119, (201609), URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/srep26119.pdf, XP055890337 [Y] 1-16 * page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep26119 | [Y] - ONOS KRISTEN D ET AL, "Toward more predictive genetic mouse models of Alzheimer's disease", BRAIN RESEARCH BULLETIN, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, OXFORD, GB, (20151217), vol. 122, doi:10.1016/J.BRAINRESBULL.2015.12.003, ISSN 0361-9230, pages 1 - 11, XP029483616 [Y] 1-16 * figure 7; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainresbull.2015.12.003 | [Y] - SHAO WEN ET AL, "Genetics of Alzheimer's disease: From pathogenesis to clinical usage", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NEUROSCIENCE, (2017), vol. 45, doi:10.1016/J.JOCN.2017.06.074, ISSN 0967-5868, pages 1 - 8, XP085232882 [Y] 1-16 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jocn.2017.06.074 | International search | [Y]US2006160079 (LANE ROGER M [US]) [Y] 2-3, 4/(2-3)* para [0020], [00129], SEQ ID NO: 6 *; | [Y] - HOLTZMAN et al., "Apolipoprotein E isoform-dependent amyloid deposition and neuritic degeneration in a mouse model of Alzheimer's disease", PNAS, (20000314), vol. 97, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.050004797, pages 2892 - 2897, XP055664650 [Y] 1-4, 36-37 * , abstract, pg 2892, col 2, para 2, pg 2895 col 2, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.050004797 | [Y] - CASTILLO et al., "Comparative profiling of cortical gene expression in Alzheimer's disease patients and mouse models demonstrates a link between amyloidosis and neuroinflammation", Scientific Reports, (20171219), vol. 7, no. 17762, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-17999-3, pages 1 - 16, XP055664654 [Y] 1-4, 36-37 * , Abstract, pg 8, para 3, pg 14, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-17999-3 | [Y] - CHENG-HATHAWAY et al., "The Trem2 R47H variant confers loss-of-function-like phenotypes in Alzheimer's disease", Mol Neurodegener, (20180601), vol. 13, no. 29, doi:10.1186/s13024-018-0262-8, pages 1 - 12, XP055664658 [Y] 1-4, 37 * , abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13024-018-0262-8 | [Y] - ATAGI et al., "Apolipoprotein E Is a Ligand for Triggering Receptor Expressed on Myeloid Cells 2 (TREM2)", J Biol Chem., (20151023), vol. 290, no. 43, doi:10.1074/jbc.M115.679043, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26043 - 26050, XP055664659 [Y] 1-4, 37 * , abstract, Pg 26048, col 2, last para - pg 26049, col 1, first para * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M115.679043 | by applicant | US5356802 | US5436150 | US5487994 | US6453242 | US6534261 | US6534643 | US6607882 | US6830910 | US6858716 | US2005064474 | US2006188987 | WO2007014275 | US7294754 | US7576259 | US7659442 | US8420782 | US8440432 | US8440431 | US8450471 | US8450107 | US2013137161 | US2013137174 | - DIBATTISTA et al., Exp. Neurol., (20160000), vol. 280, pages 97 - 105 | - BU et al., Nature Reviews Neuroscience, (20090000), vol. 10, pages 333 - 344 | - HUANG et al., Cell, (20170000), vol. 168, pages 1 - 15 | - TAMBINI et al., EMBO Reports, (20160000), vol. 17, pages 27 - 36 | - LI, L. et al., DNA Seq, (19990000), vol. 10, no. 4-5, pages 219 - 28 | - PODLISNY, M.B. et al., Am J Pathol, (19910000), vol. 138, no. 6, pages 1423 - 35 | - ROSEN, R.F. et al., Neurobiol Aging, (20160000), vol. 44, pages 185 - 196 | - ROYCHAUDHURI, R. et al., ACS Chem Neurosci, (20150000), vol. 6, no. 12, pages 1941 - 55 | - PABO et al., Ann. Rev. Biochem., (20010000), vol. 70, pages 313 - 340 | - "Embryonic stem cells: methods and protocols", Embryonic stem cells: methods and protocols in Methods Mol Biol, Humana Press, (20020000), page 185 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, page 403 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3379 - 3388 | - SCHORNACK et al., J. Plant Physiol., (20060000), vol. 163, no. 3, pages 256 - 272 | - CHOO et al., Curr Opin. Struct. Biol., (20000000), vol. 10, pages 411 - 416 | - A. NAGYM. GERTSENSTEINK. VINTERSTENR. BEHRINGER, Embryonic stem cells: methods and protocols in Methods in Molecular Biology, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (20020000), vol. 185 | - MEYER et al., PNAS USA, (20100000), vol. 107, no. 34, pages 15022 - 15026 | - MEYER et al., PNAS USA, vol. 107, no. 34, pages 15022 - 15026 | - HORVATH, Science, (20100000), vol. 327, pages 167 - 170 | - BARRANGOU et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1709 - 1712 | - MAKAROVA et al., Nature Reviews Microbiology, vol. 9, pages 467 - 477 | - HAFT et al., PLoS Comput Biol., (20050000), vol. 1, no. 6, page e60 | - GASIUNAS et al., PNAS, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 17484 - 17489 | - JINEK et al., Science, (20120000), vol. 337, pages 816 - 821 | - DELTCHEVA et al., Nature, vol. 471, pages 602 - 607 | - MARRAFFINISONTHEIMER, Nature Reviews Genetics, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 181 - 190 | - CARROLL, Molecular Therapy, (20120000), vol. 20, pages 1658 - 1660 | - CHANG et al., Cell Research, (20130000), vol. 23, pages 720 - 723 | - JIANG et al., Nature Biotechnol, (20130000), vol. 31, pages 233 - 239 | - MALI et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 823 - 826 | - WANG et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 153, pages 1173 - 1183 | - SCHOLZEBOCH, Curr Opin Microbiol, (20110000), vol. 14, pages 47 - 53 | - BONAS et al., Mol Gen Genet, (19890000), vol. 218, pages 127 - 136 | - MOSCOUBOGDANOVE, Science, (20090000), vol. 326, pages 1509 - 1512 | - GAJ et al., Trends in Biotechnol, (20130000), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 397 - 405 | - KIM et al., PNAS, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 1156 - 1160 | - CHRISTIAN et al., Genetics, (20100000), vol. 186, pages 451 - 459 | - LI et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20110000), vol. 39, pages 6315 - 6325 | - MILLER et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20110000), vol. 29, pages 143 - 148 | - ANSAI et al., Genetics, (20130000), vol. 193, pages 739 - 749 | - HOCKEMEYER et al., Nature Biotechnol., (20110000), vol. 29, pages 731 - 734 | - MOORE et al., PLoS ONE, (20120000), vol. 7, page e37877 | - STROUD et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20130000), vol. 288, pages 1685 - 1690 | - WEFERS et al., PNAS, (20130000), vol. 110, pages 3782 - 3787 | - MAKKERH et al., Curr Biol., (19960000), vol. 6, pages 1025 - 1027 | - KALDERON, Cell, (19840000), vol. 39, pages 499 - 509 | - DINGWALLET et al., J Cell Biol., (19880000), vol. 107, pages 841 - 9 | - MCLANECORBETT, IUBMB Life, (20090000), vol. 61, pages 697 - 70 | - LI et al., PNAS, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 2764 - 2768 | - HAUSCHILD et al., PNAS, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 12013 - 12017 | - ORLANDO et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20100000), vol. 38, pages e152 - e152 | - PORTEUSCARROLL, Nature Biotechnology, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 967 - 973 | - BEERLI, Nature Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 20, pages 135 - 141 | - ISALAN et al., Nature Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 19, pages 656 - 660 | - SEGAL et al., Curr Opin. Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 12, pages 632 - 637 | - SERA et al., Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, pages 7074 - 7081 | - MAKKERH et al., Current Biology, (19960000), vol. 6, pages 1025 - 1027 | - LI et al., PNAS, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4275 - 4279 | - KIM et al., PNAS, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 883 - 887 | - KIM et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 31978 - 31982 | - ROBERTS et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 418 - 420 | - BITINAITE et al., PNAS, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 10,570 - 10,575 | - ABBOUD, S. L. et al., J. Histochem & Cytochem., (20030000), vol. 51, no. 7, pages 941 - 949 | - SCHORPP et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19960000), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 1787 - 1788 | - MCBURNEY, M. W. et al., Devel. Dynamics, (19940000), vol. 200, pages 278 - 293 | - MAJUMDER, M. et al., Blood, (19960000), vol. 87, no. 8, pages 3203 - 3211 | - BUEHR, M. et al., "Genesis of embryonic stem cells. Philosophical Transactions of the Royal Society B", Biological Sciences, (20030000), vol. 358, pages 1397 - 1402 | - NAGY et al., Development, (19900000), vol. 110, pages 815 - 821 | - KRAUS et al., Genesis, (20100000), vol. 48, pages 394 - 399 | - RADU et al., "An in vivo Assay to Test Blood Vessel Permeability.", J. Vis. Exp., (20130000), no. 73, page 50062 | - Oligonucleotide Synthesis: Methods and Applications, Humana Press |