EP3813404 - RESOURCE INDICATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yumin c/o Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283, BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19821825.7 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN88877 | Priority number, date | CN201810632461 | 19.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810632461 | [2021/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242464 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813404 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W72/04, H04W56/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W72/51 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04L25/0226 (US);
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04W16/10 (CN);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W76/11 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04W16/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENANZEIGEVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2021/17] | English: | RESOURCE INDICATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, ET SYSTÈME D'INDICATION DE RESSOURCE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | Translation filed | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016124159 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042] *; | [XY] - CATT, "UE capability temporary restrictions", vol. RAN WG2, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170629, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1706391 UE CAPABLILITY TEMPORARY RESTRICTIONS -V4, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300902 [X] 1,2,5,6,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs 1 to 5 * [Y] 3,4,7-9,11,13 | [XY] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 15)", (20180518), 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_R2-180XXXX TS 36.331 BASELINE CR FOR THE UE CAPABILITIES_REV0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLI, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Email%5FDiscussions/RAN2/[RAN2%23101bis]/[101bis%2348][NR]%20UE%20capabilites%20structure, (20180518), XP051566186 [X] 1,2,5,6,10,12,14,15 * page 193, paragraph 5.6.9 to page 198, paragraph 5.6.10, line 8; pages 267 to 269; pages 532 and 564; * [Y] 3,4,7-9,11,13 | [A] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "RRM requirement under IDC interference from LAA WiFi Hardware Sharing", vol. RAN WG4, no. Busan, South Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180514), 3GPP DRAFT; R4-1807933 RRM REQUIREMENT UNDER IDC INTERFERENCE FROM LAA WIFI HARDWARE SHARING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG4%5FRadio/TSGR4%5F87/Docs/R4%2D1807933%2Ezip, (20180514), XP051578085 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); User Equipment (UE) radio access capabilities (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION; 3GPP TS 36.306, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20180403), vol. RAN WG2, no. V15.0.0, pages 1 - 86, XP051450929 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs 4.3.15.8 to 4.3.15.11 * | International search | [A]US2018007731 (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al)[A] 1-21; | [X] - ERICSSON, "Measurement Requirements for LAA/WiFi Hardware Sharing Problem", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #101 R2-1803836, (20170302), vol. RAN WG2, XP051400852 [X] 1-21 * , * | [X] - VIVO, "TP of 36.331 on the IDC report of NR frequency in EN-DC", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 Meeting #102 R2-1807635, (2018052), vol. RAN WG2, XP051443992 [X] 1-21 * , * | [A] - CATT, "UE capability temporary restrictions", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #99 R2-1707891, (20170820), vol. RAN WG2, XP051317826 [A] 1-21 * , * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Analysis of measurement requirements under sharing of hardware between LAA and WiFi", 3GPP TSG RAN WG4 Meeting #86bis R4-1805029, (20180415), vol. RAN WG4, XP051431827 [A] 1-21 * , * |