EP3811708 - SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK GRANT-FREE NON-ORTHOGONAL MULTIPLE ACCESS TRANSMISSION DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Qiaoyu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Kai 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19822137.6 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN90857 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN92377 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/092377 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242544 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811708 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W74/08 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04W74/08 (EP,US);
H04B1/69 (US);
H04L5/0005 (EP);
H04L5/0012 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | ENTWURF FÜR SYNCHRONISIERTE BERECHTIGUNGSFREIE, NICHTORTHOGONALE MEHRFACHZUGRIFFSÜBERTRAGUNG | [2021/17] | English: | SYNCHRONIZED UPLINK GRANT-FREE NON-ORTHOGONAL MULTIPLE ACCESS TRANSMISSION DESIGN | [2021/17] | French: | CONCEPTION DE TRANSMISSION À ACCÈS MULTIPLE NON ORTHOGONAL SANS AUTORISATION DE LIAISON MONTANTE SYNCHRONISÉE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017198197 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0113] *; | [Y]US2018124715 (XU XIUQIANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0099] *; | [YA]WO2018107944 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 9,10 * page 6 *[A] 12 | International search | [A]WO2018064582 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018107944 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-30 * description, page 16, line 11 to page 20, line 12 *; | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "Solutions for collisions of MA signatures", 3GPP TSG RAN WGI Meeting #86bis R1-1608860, (20161014), XP051159187 [A] 1-30 * , the whole document * | by applicant | WO2017198197 | US2018124715 | WO2018107944 |