EP3813488 - LIGHTING CONTROL SYSTEM, LIGHTING CONTROL METHOD, AND LIGHTING CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iris Communication Kabushiki Kaisha 3-24-4, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | For all designated states Nico Corporation 3-24-4, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Iris Communication Kabushiki Kaisha 1-5-1, Higashikanda Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010031 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nico Corporation NBC Building 9F, 2-19-1, Tamachi, Ichigaya Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0843 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Masafumi Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/17] | 01 /
YANO, Masafumi 1-12-9, Asahigaokatsutsumi Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-8004 / JP | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Lewis Silkin LLP 5 Chancery Lane Clifford's Inn London EC4A 1BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19822462.8 | 28.03.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019JP13580 | Priority number, date | JP20180115719 | 19.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018115719 | [2021/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019244431 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813488 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/06, H05B45/10, G06V10/141 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
H05B47/105 (EP,US);
A61B3/06 (EP);
G06V10/141 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06V40/16 (EP,US);
G06V40/172 (US);
H05B45/10 (EP);
H05B45/20 (EP);
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H05B37/02, A61B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM, BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2021/17] | English: | LIGHTING CONTROL SYSTEM, LIGHTING CONTROL METHOD, AND LIGHTING CONTROL PROGRAM | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'ÉCLAIRAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2020 | Translation filed | 14.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 23.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2008181874 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] , [0035] - [0039] - [0058] , [0099] , [0102] * [Y] 2-4,11,15-17,23,24,26 [I] 6,12,13,19,25; | [YA]JP2013041718 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 4,17 * paragraphs [0027] , [0030] - [0038] * [A] 12,25; | [YA]KR20160113861 (PARK JUN CHUL [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,15,16,19,24 * paragraphs [0015] - [0019] - [0030] * [A] 12,25; | [YA]WO2017123702 (PRINCETON IDENTITY INC [US]) [Y] 11,23,24,26 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0087]; figure 1 *[A] 12,25; | [XYI]US2018129050 (HAYASHI SHINGO [JP], et al) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0034] - [0091]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-4,6,11,15-17,19,23,24,26 [I] 5-10,12,13,18-22,25 | International search | [XYA]JP2008181874 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-3, 12-16, 25 * , * [Y] 4-5, 17-18, 26 [A] 6-11, 19-24; | [YA]JP2013041718 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 5, 18, 26 * , *[A] 1-4, 6-17, 19- 25; | [YA]JP2017527087 [Y] 4, 17, 26 * , * [A] 1-3, 5-16, 18- 25 | by applicant | JP2010262806 |