EP3798746 - VEHICLE LANE CHANGE CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Wall Motor Company Limited No.2266 Chaoyang South St. Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Ning No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street, Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Jian No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street, Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 03 /
HE, Lin No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street, Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 04 /
GE, Jianyong No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street, Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Tianpei No. 2266 Chaoyang South Street, Lianchi District Baoding, Hebei 071000 / CN | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19822877.7 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019CN92238 | Priority number, date | CN201810652866 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810652866 | [2021/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242718 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798746 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3798746 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/42, B60W10/20, B60W30/18, G08G1/16, // B60W50/00 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B60W30/18163 (EP,US);
G05B11/42 (CN);
B60W10/20 (EP,US);
B60W40/105 (US);
G08G1/167 (EP);
B60W2050/0009 (EP);
B60W2510/20 (EP,US);
B60W2520/06 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | G05B11/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FAHRSPURWECHSEL | [2021/13] | English: | VEHICLE LANE CHANGE CONTROL METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHANGEMENT DE VOIE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2020 | Translation filed | 24.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010082195 (LEE JIN-WOO [US], et al) [A] 1,6,10-12* paragraphs [0025] - [0026] *; | [I]CN102358287 (UNIV BEIHANG) [I] 1,6,10-12 * claims 1,5 *; | [XAI]US2016185388 (SIM SANG KYUN [KR]) [X] 1,6,10-12 * figures 1,2,3B,6,8,9 * * claims 1,2,6,8 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0048] - [ 0060] , [ 0070] - [0076] - [ 0083] - [0090] * [A] 3-5,8,9 [I] 2,7 | International search | [X]CN102358287 (UNIV BEIHANG) [X] 1, 6, 10-12; | [A]US8428843 (LEE JIN-WOO [US], et al)[A] 1-12; | [A]CN104097637 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN104360687 (BEIJING GEN RES INST MINING, et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]CN106080941 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [A] 1-12 |