EP3813455 - RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD, NODE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMBA DIT ADAMOU, Boubacar 283, BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
SHEN, Xiaodong 283, BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
BAO, Wei 283, BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19823167.2 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN92030 | Priority number, date | CN201810645638 | 21.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810645638 | [2021/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242674 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813455 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04B7/155 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/15542 (EP);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W72/27 (CN,US);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04W72/21 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, KNOTEN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG | [2021/17] | English: | RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD, NODE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES, NOEUD ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2021 | Translation filed | 08.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 07.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016295565 (KIM MYOUNGSEOB [KR], et al) [X] 10,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0037]; figures 5-16 * * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0161] * * paragraph [0211] - paragraph [0309] * [I] 12; | [XI] - SONY, "Discussion on NR enhancements to support IAB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180511), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1806572_DISCUSSION ON NR ENHANCEMENTS TO SUPPORT IAB_REV2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F93/Docs, (20180511), XP051461899 [X] 1-8,13,14 * page 2 - page 3; figure 1 * [I] 9 | [A] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Physical layer enhancement on IAB", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sanya, China; 20180416 - 20180420, (20180415), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1803695, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180415), XP051425992 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN101212757 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-33 * entire document *; | [A]EP2242298 (VODAFONE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-33* entire document *; | [X]WO2011038528 (ALCATEL LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL [CN], et al) [X] 1-33 * description, page 6, line 9 to page 9, line 15, and figures 4-9 * |