EP3799498 - COMMAND PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Jianping 283, BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Xiaodong 283, BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Li 283, BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19823275.3 | 30.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019CN89384 | Priority number, date | CN201810654978 | 22.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810654978 | [2021/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019242482 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799498 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799498 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, // H04W72/23, H04W74/08 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04L5/0098 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/32] | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, // H04W72/14, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2021/13] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TIMER-VERARBEITUNG UND ENDGERÄTVORRICHTUNG | [2021/13] | English: | COMMAND PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2021/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE COMMANDE ET DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | Translation filed | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 31.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | IT | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9131468 (LEE CHIEN-MIN [TW]) [A] 1,15 * figure 6 *; | [A]WO2017063479 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0152]; figure 3 *; | [P]US2018234896 (LIU YALIN [CN], et al); | [XI] - ERICSSON (RAPPORTEUR), "Correction to switching of bandwidth part and random access", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan, Republic of Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180511), 3GPP DRAFT; 38321_CR0067R1_R2-1807272 - CORRECTION TO SWITCHING OF BANDWIDTH PART AND RANDOM ACCESS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-0, URL: 1http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F102/Docs, (20180511), XP051464326 [X] 1-5,13,15 * Section 5.15 * [I] 4-12,14 | International search | [X]CN102088433 (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-32 * description, paragraphs [0113]-[0141] *; | [A]CN102271415 (ZTE CORPORATION) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]WO2012164531 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP, et al) [A] 1-32* entire document *; | [A]CN108093481 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-32 * entire document * |