EP3809998 - INSTRUMENT ALIGNMENT FEEDBACK SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruthless, LLC D/B/A Ruthless Spine 6750 Central Ave., Blvd. B Riverside CA 92504 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAK, Shane S. P.O. Box 661357 Arcadia, CA 91066 / US | 02 /
SPINDLE, Karlton E. P.O. Box 391 Cedar Glen, CA 92321 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19823563.2 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US38298 | Priority number, date | US201862763564P | 21.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862763564 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019246432 | Date: | 26.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809998 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20, A61B34/00, A61B90/98, A61M5/178, A61M5/42, // A61B17/70, A61B90/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61M5/427 (EP,KR);
A61B34/20 (EP,KR);
A61B90/06 (KR,US);
A61B34/25 (EP,KR);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B90/98 (EP);
A61M5/178 (EP);
A61B17/7092 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,KR);
A61B2034/2051 (EP);
A61B2090/067 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2090/0811 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | A61B17/70, A61B17/17, A61B34/20, A61B17/88, A61B90/00, A61B17/00, A61B17/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR INSTRUMENTENAUSRICHTUNG | [2021/17] | English: | INSTRUMENT ALIGNMENT FEEDBACK SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉTROACTION D'ALIGNEMENT D'INSTRUMENT | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2901957 (UNIV BASEL [CH], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0036] - [0041] *; | [X]WO2016131016 (SCAPA FLOW LLC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * figures 3A-7 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0068] *; | [A]WO2017116751 (DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1A-4 ** paragraphs [0033] - [0041] *; | [X]US2017231709 (GUPTA SAURAV V [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 2-27J * * paragraphs [0119] - [0132] * * paragraphs [0197] - [0224] * | International search | [A]US2009163901 (FISHER MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0040], claim 1 and figures 1A-4. *; | [A]US2010100130 (CARL ALLEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0112]-[0121], claim 1 and figures 22E-22H. *; | [X]US2012179070 (POMMER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002], [0080]-[0092], claims 1, 3-7 and figures 1-6. *; | [A]WO2017055144 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-20 * See pages 10-12, claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US9814393 (MAO JIMMY JIAN-MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See column 5, line 64 - column 10, line 19 and figures 1-3. * |