EP3887541 - SECURITY MARKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crime Solutions Limited Westland Square Dewsbury Road Leeds LS11 5SS / GB | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAXWELL, Paul Crime Solutions Limited Westland Square, Dewsbury Road Leeds LS11 5SS / GB | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Stephenson, Philip Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19823879.2 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019EP82815 | Priority number, date | GB20180019256 | 27.11.2018 Original published format: GB 201819256 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020109432 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887541 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6813 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6813 (EP);
C12Q1/68 (GB);
G06F21/32 (US);
C12Q1/6816 (US);
G08B15/00 (GB);
G09F3/00 (GB);
C12Q1/6844 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6813, C12Q2563/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSMARKER | [2021/40] | English: | SECURITY MARKERS | [2021/40] | French: | MARQUEURS DE SÉCURITÉ | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 25.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]CN1360210 (BODE GENE DEV CO LTD SHANGHAI [CN]) [X] 1,2,6-8,12 * the whole document * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] *[Y] 4,5,9-11,13-18; | [XYI]WO02066678 (CRIME SOLUTIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,14,15 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * * page 8, line 13 - line 14 * * page 11, line 1 - line 8 * * page 14 * [Y] 4,5,9-11,13-18 [I] 3-5,9,10,13,16-18 | by applicant | WO8706383 | WO9014441 | US5139812 | WO9404918 | WO9502702 | EP20000977665 | WO2000GB04419 |