EP3886681 - MEDICAL IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STITH, Curtis W. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
DICARLO, Jeffrey M. 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
LIU, Changmeng 1020 Kifer Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19824080.6 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63182 | Priority number, date | US201862774041P | 30.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862774041 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112726 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886681 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, H04N5/225 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
A61B5/0071 (EP,US);
A61B1/000096 (US);
A61B1/043 (US);
A61B1/05 (US);
A61B1/0638 (US);
A61B1/0646 (US);
A61B5/6852 (EP);
H04N23/56 (EP);
H04N23/843 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR MEDIZINISCHE BILDGEBUNG | [2021/40] | English: | MEDICAL IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2021/40] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IMAGERIE MÉDICALE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 28.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001007921 (HAYASHI KATSUMI [JP]); | [A]US2006241496 (FENGLER JOHN J [CA], et al); | [A]US2008239070 (WESTWICK PAUL [CA], et al); | [A]EP2017591 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2009117483 (NOVADAQ TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al); | [XY]US2011279716 (SHINTANI DAI [JP]); | [A]US2013041221 (MCDOWALL IAN [US], et al); | [A]US2015381909 (BUTTE PRAMOD [US], et al); | [X]KR101723794B (UNIV INCHEON IND ACAD COOP FOUND [KR]); | [Y]WO2018164579 (QUEST PHOTONIC DEVICES B V [NL]) |