EP3893663 - METHOD OF TREATING A FEED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EW Nutrition GmbH Hogenbögen 1 49429 Visbek / DE | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEPE, Daniel Unter den Eichen 24 26122 Oldenburg / DE | 02 /
ATIENZA, Cristian Siedenbögen 4 Hubertusmühle 49429 Visbek / DE | 03 /
MICHELS, Andreas Lindemannstraße 110 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19824277.8 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019EP84919 | Priority number, date | GB20180020205 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: GB 201820205 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120689 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3893663 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A23K10/14, A23K40/00, A23K40/10, A23K50/10, A23N17/00 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
A23K10/14 (EP,US);
A23K40/10 (EP,US);
A23K10/38 (US);
A23K40/00 (EP);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23N17/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES ZUFUHRMATERIALS | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING A FEED MATERIAL | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MATIÈRE D'ALIMENTATION | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/28] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2022/28] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.05.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1313417 (UNITED NATIONS CHILDRENS FUND, et al) [X] 1,3-11,13,15-18,20 * example 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2,12,14; | [X]WO9963053 (KELLOG CO [US]) [X] 15-20 * example 1 *; | [X]WO2018096180 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [X] 15-20 * example 1 *; | [X]US2003232109 (DAWLEY LARRY J [US], et al) [X] 15-20 * example 1 *; | [X]RU2552084 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (2015), vol. 2015, no. 39, Database accession no. 2015-342796, XP002798132 & RU2552084 C1 20150610 (TEKNOFID CO LTD) [X] 15-17 * abstract * | by applicant | EP3074426 | US8962286 | EP3573744 | - HEDEGAARD et al., Bioresource Technology, (20080700), vol. 99, no. 10, pages 4221 - 4228 | - RAMOS M.CARABANIO R.BOISEN S., "An in vitro method for estimating digestibility in rabbits", Journal of Applied Rabbit Research, (19920000), vol. 15, pages 938 - 946 | - "In vitro digestibility of energy and amino acids in pig feeds", BOISEN, S.FERNANDEZ, J. A., Digestive Physiology in Pigs, (19910000), pages 231 - 236 | - "Critical evaluation of in vitro methods for estimating digestibility in simple stomach animals", BOISEN S.EGGUM B.O, Nutrition Research Reviews, National Institute of Animal Science, (19910000), vol. 4, pages 141 - 162 | - ENGLYST H, "Classification and measurement of plant polysaccharides", Animal Feed Science and Technology, (19890000), vol. 23, pages 27 - 42 | - "American Society of Agricultural and Biological Engineers. 2008 R2012. Method of Determining and Expressing Fineness of Feed Materials by Sieving", A. S. Engineers, American Society of Agricultural and Biological Engineers | - PFOST, H. B., Grinding and Rolling. Feed Manufacturing Technology II, American Feed Manufacturers Association, (19760000), pages 71 - 85 | - "The effect of sieve agitators and dispersing agent on the Fahrenholz, A. and C. R. Stark. 2014. Mixing feeds and mixer test procedures for batch mixers", STARK, C. R.CHEWNING, C. G., Feed Additive Compendium, Miller Publishing Co, (20120000), pages 105 - 108 | - "Mix time affects diet uniformity and growth performance of nursery and finishing pigs", TRAYLOR, S.L.J.D. HANCOCKK.C. BEHNKEC.R. STARKR.H. HINES, KSU Swine Day Report, Pages 171-175. Kansas State University Agricultural Experiment Station and Cooperative Extension Service, Kansas State University, (19940000), pages 171 - 175 | - WICKER, D.L.D.R. POOLE, "How is your mixer performing?", Feed Management, (19910000), vol. 42, page 40 |