EP3816199 - HYDROGENATED BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoto c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 36, Towada Kamisu-shi, Ibaraki 314-0197 / JP | 02 /
NOJIMA, Yusuke c/o KURARAY CO., LTD., 2-28, Kurashiki-cho Tainai-shi, Niigata 959-2691 / JP | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19824530.0 | 28.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019JP25862 | Priority number, date | JP20180125338 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: JP 2018125338 | JP20180245574 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018245574 | [2021/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020004631 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816199 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3816199 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/04, C08L53/02, C08L23/12, C08F8/04, A61J1/10, B32B27/30 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61J1/1468 (EP);
C08F297/04 (KR);
C08L53/025 (EP,US);
A61J1/10 (EP,KR);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR);
B65D65/40 (KR);
C08F112/08 (US);
C08F136/06 (US);
C08F136/08 (US);
C08F297/046 (EP);
C08F8/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L23/10 (KR);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (US);
C08L53/02 (KR);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2250/246 (EP);
B32B2307/31 (US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2439/46 (US);
B32B2439/70 (EP);
B32B2439/80 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/04, C08F297/046 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L53/025 (EP);
C08L23/14, C08L53/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | C08F297/04, C08L53/02, C08L23/12, C08F8/04, A61J1/10, B32B27/30, B65D65/40 | ||
Former IPC [2021/18] | C08F297/04, A61J1/10, B32B27/30, B65D65/40, C08L23/10, C08L53/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRIERTES BLOCKCOPOLYMER | [2021/18] | English: | HYDROGENATED BLOCK COPOLYMER | [2021/18] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE SÉQUENCÉ HYDROGÉNÉ | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2020 | Translation filed | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.07.2023 | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
CZ | 12.07.2023 | ||
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11130828 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1492830 (KRATON POLYMERS RES BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015344684 (KUSANOSE YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP3095808 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * compound HV14 * | International search | [A]JP2014520928 [A] 1-15* , [0286] & US 2013/001507 & KR 10-2014-0043810 A *; | [A]JP2016155604 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-15 * , [0062], [0066] & US 2016/0287474 A1, [0194], [0202] & TW 201542195 A & KR 10-2016-0057497 A & CN 105705427 A * | by applicant | JP2009149861 | JP2016155604 |