EP3814251 - KINEMATIC IDLER ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENSVAD, Karl K. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
CILISKE, Scott L. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SWANSON, Ronald P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19825135.7 | 21.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019IB55265 | Priority number, date | US201862690448P | 27.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690448 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020003082 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814251 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G39/09, F16C23/00, F16C17/22, F16C13/02, F16C13/06, F16C23/08, F16C25/04, F16C25/08 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
F16C13/02 (EP);
F16C13/06 (EP,US);
B65G39/09 (US);
F16C13/024 (EP);
F16C23/043 (EP,US);
F16C23/084 (EP);
F16C25/04 (EP);
F16C25/083 (EP);
F16C13/00 (EP);
F16C2326/58 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | B65G39/09, F16C23/00, F16C17/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | KINEMATISCHE SPANNROLLE | [2021/18] | English: | KINEMATIC IDLER ROLLER | [2021/18] | French: | GALET PORTEUR CINÉMATIQUE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 05.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0715087 (SKF AB [SE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * [A] 7[I] 6; | [XAI]DE19841712 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,11,13,14 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 7 [I] 5,6,9,10,12,15; | [XAI]DE102010060494 (ANDRITZ KUESTERS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 4 * [A] 7 [I] 6 | International search | [X]US4664243 (MARTIN DONALD E [US]) [X] 1-15 * Figures 1-3; column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 44; column 5, lines 44-53 *; | [A]CN2232510Y (KANG ZHONGAO [CN]) [A] * Whole document of the original non-English language document (a machine translation is enclosed only for your reference) *; | [A]JPH11139535 (INOUE TAKESHI) [A] * Whole document of the machine translation * |