EP3814508 - INFLUENZA VIRUS HEMAGGLUTININ MUTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aramis Biotechnologies Inc. 2552 boulevard du Parc-Technologique Québec City QC G1P 4S6 / CA | [2024/35] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Medicago Inc. 1020 route de l'Eglise Suite 600 Québec, Québec G1V 3V9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVOIE, Pierre-Olivier 621 Franklin Quebec, Québec G1N 2L7 / CA | 02 /
LORIN, Aurélien 2624 Rue du Père-Druillettes Quebec, Québec G1V 1B1 / CA | 03 /
DOUCET, Alain 245, rue Hamel Saint-Gilles, Québec G0S 2P0 / CA | 04 /
D'AOUST, Marc-André 3925 rue Louise-Fiset Quebec, Québec G1X 4N4 / CA | 05 /
COUTURE, Manon 4880, Lionel-Groulx app. 301 Quebec, Québec G3A 1Z5 / CA | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan SKM-IP PartGmbB Oberanger 45 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19825331.2 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019CA50892 | Priority number, date | US201862690780P | 27.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690780 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020000100 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814508 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/44, A01H5/00, A61K39/145, C07K14/11, C07K16/10, C12N15/82, C12N5/10, C12N7/00, C12N7/01, C12P21/00 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N7/00 (KR,US);
A61K38/00 (KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,IL);
A61K39/145 (KR,US);
A61P31/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (KR,US);
C07K14/11 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/10 (EP,IL,US);
C07K16/1018 (KR,US);
C12N15/8257 (US);
C12N15/8258 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2760/16023 (KR,US);
C12N2760/16033 (KR,US);
C12N2760/16122 (KR,US);
C12N2760/16123 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | INFLUENZAVIRUS-HÄMAGGLUTININ-MUTANTEN | [2021/18] | English: | INFLUENZA VIRUS HEMAGGLUTININ MUTANTS | [2021/18] | French: | MUTANTS D'HÉMAGGLUTININE DU VIRUS DE LA GRIPPE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2570484 (MEDICAGO INC [CA]); | [Y]WO2013044390 (MEDICAGO INC [CA]); | [Y]WO2018078053 (CUREVAC AG [DE], et al); | International search | [Y]WO2009009876 (MEDICAGO INC [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2018073340 (REDBIOTEC AG [CH], et al); |