EP3813507 - GRIPPER WITH TUNABLE COMPLIANCE FOR DEXTEROUS OBJECT MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPHARVEST TECHNOLOGY, INC. 78 Olympia Avenue Ste. F Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Root AI, Inc. 78 Olympia Avenue Ste. F Woburn, MA 01801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOPF, Ryan, R. Root Al, Inc. 78 Olympia Avenue, Ste. F Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 02 /
LESSING, Joshua, Aaron Root Al, Inc. 78 Olympia Avenue, Ste. F Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 03 /
CHRISOS, Jason, A. Root Al, Inc. 78 Olympia Avenue, Ste. F Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19825340.3 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US39254 | Priority number, date | US201862690080P | 26.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690080 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020006086 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813507 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01D46/00, A01D46/24, A01D46/30, B25J9/00, B25J15/00, B25J15/02, B25J15/04, B25J15/12 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
B25J15/12 (EP);
A01D46/30 (EP,US);
A01D46/253 (US);
B25J11/0045 (US);
B25J13/082 (US);
B25J13/085 (US);
B25J13/088 (US);
B25J15/0014 (US);
B25J15/0033 (EP,US);
B25J15/0226 (EP);
B25J15/04 (EP);
A01D46/28 (US);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | A01D46/00, A01D46/24, A01D46/30, B25J9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | GREIFER MIT ABSTIMMBARER NACHGIEBIGKEIT ZUR GESCHICKTEN MANIPULATION VON OBJEKTEN | [2021/18] | English: | GRIPPER WITH TUNABLE COMPLIANCE FOR DEXTEROUS OBJECT MANIPULATION | [2021/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉHENSION À ADAPTATION RÉGLABLE POUR LA MANIPULATION D'OBJET AVEC DES DOIGTS | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 29.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3387444 (LJUBOMIR KRDZIC); | [XYI]US4034542 (LOEHR LESLIE K); | [Y]DE3011837 (SOMMER FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [A]US5895084 (MAURO GEORGE [US]); | [A]US2015314893 (REMBALA RICHARD [CA], et al); | [X]CN106342484 (UNIV JIANGSU); | [X]US2018049371 (PITZER ROBERT [US]) | International search | [XY]US6116118 (WESCH JR WILLIAM E [US]); | [Y]US2005230444 (ALLING JON [US], et al); | [Y]US2015257839 (VAUSE CARL EVERETT [US], et al); | [A]US2016073584 (DAVIDSON JOSEPH RYAN [US], et al); | [A]US2016375590 (LESSING JOSHUA AARON [US], et al); | [A]WO2018015416 (OCTINION BVBA [BE]); | [XY]US2018049371 (PITZER ROBERT [US]); | by applicant | US4034542 | DE3011837 | CN106342484 | US2018049371 |