EP3813940 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ACCELERATED ONLINE ADAPTIVE RADIATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Medical College of Wisconsin, Inc. 8701 Watertown Plank Road Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Allen X. 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Ying 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 03 /
LIM, Sara 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Jingqiao 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 05 /
AHUNBAY, Ergun 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 06 /
THAPA, Ranjeeta 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | 07 /
NASIEF, Haidy 9200 W. Wisconsin Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53226 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19825536.6 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US39159 | Priority number, date | US201862690289P | 26.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690289 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020006032 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813940 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10, A61B6/00, A61B6/03, G06T7/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/13, G16H50/20 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP);
A61N5/1031 (EP,US);
A61N5/1038 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06T5/40 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/12 (EP);
G06T7/149 (EP,US);
G06T7/174 (EP,US);
G06T7/33 (EP);
G16H10/60 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP);
A61B6/5217 (EP);
G06T2207/10081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10088 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHLEUNIGTEN ONLINE-ADAPTIVEN STRAHLENTHERAPIE | [2021/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ACCELERATED ONLINE ADAPTIVE RADIATION THERAPY | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACCÉLÉRATION DE LA RADIOTHÉRAPIE ADAPTATIVE EN LIGNE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015297916 (CHEN HSIN-CHEN [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2013294671 (IIDA HIDEHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2015297916 (CHEN HSIN-CHEN [US], et al); | [A]US2017193662 (ZHOU YAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2018048575 (ELEKTA INC [US]); | [A]US2018099152 (NIOUTSIKOU ELENA [DE]); |