EP3817244 - CSI FEEDBACK METHOD, APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND BASE STATION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Hao ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
LU, Zhaohua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
JIANG, Chuangxin ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Xianghui ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
XIA, Shuqiang ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 06 /
GAO, Bo ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Tiburzi, Andrea, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19826114.1 | 25.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019CN92758 | Priority number, date | CN201810711948 | 29.06.2018 Original published format: CN201810711948 | [2021/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001428 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817244 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04B7/06 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0057 (EP,CN);
H04B7/0626 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0413 (CN,US);
H04B7/0645 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04L1/0027 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | CSI-RÜCKMELDEVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄT, BASISSTATION UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/18] | English: | CSI FEEDBACK METHOD, APPARATUS, TERMINAL, AND BASE STATION, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉTROACTION DE CSI, APPAREIL, TERMINAL, ET STATION DE BASE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2021 | Translation filed | 07.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - NTT DOCOMO, "On Feedback Enhancements to Support Advanced CSI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1612701 ADVANCED CSI, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051176644 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2015381255 (KUO PING-HENG [TW]) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]CN106301509 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-27* entire document *; | [A]CN107733500 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]CN108023617 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [X] - ZTE, "Remaining issues on CSI reporting", 3GPP Draft, Rl-1805827, (20180520), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs, XP051441047 [X] 1, 10, 19, 22, 25-27 * , sections 2 and 3 * |