EP3777895 - ANTI-BCMA ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABL Bio Inc. 2F 16 Daewangpangyo-ro 712 beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Kyungjin 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 02 /
CHUNG, Hyejin 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Kyeongsu 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Yangsoon 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 05 /
CHANG, Mikyung 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 06 /
JEON, Jaehyoung 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Youngkwang 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 08 /
JEONG, Junhyun 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 09 /
YOO, Jiseon 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 10 /
KIM, Yeunju 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 11 /
YEOM, Donghoon 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 12 /
KIM, Eunjung 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 13 /
LEE, Bora 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | 14 /
JUNG, Jinwon 2F, 16, Daewangpangyo-ro 712beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13488 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19826406.1 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR07727 | Priority number, date | KR20180073320 | 26.06.2018 Original published format: KR 20180073320 | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020004934 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777895 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/68, C07K16/28, A61K31/40, A61P35/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/2878 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61K31/40 (KR);
A61K47/6849 (KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/32 (EP);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/732 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | A61K47/68, C07K16/28, A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | ANTI-BCMA-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/07] | English: | ANTI-BCMA ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF | [2021/07] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-BCMA ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2020 | Translation filed | 26.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 15.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012066058 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2016090327 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2018083204 (ENGMAB SARL [CH]) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ODEN FELIX ET AL, "Potent anti-tumor response by targeting B cell maturation antigen (BCMA) in a mouse model of multiple myeloma", MOLECULAR ONCOLOGY, (20150331), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.MOLONC.2015.03.010, ISSN 1574-7891, pages 1348 - 1358, XP029252531 [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molonc.2015.03.010 | [Y] - Dissertation, "Generation of an antibody targeting B cell maturation antigen for the treatment of multiple myeloma and autoimmune diseases", (20140401), URL: http://www.diss.fu-berlin.de/diss/servlets/MCRFileNodeServlet/FUDISS_derivate_000000016111/Dissertation_FO_ohne.pdf, (20150615), XP055195743 [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document * | [Y] - KEVIN M. FRIEDMAN ET AL, "Effective Targeting of Multiple B-Cell Maturation Antigen-Expressing Hematological Malignances by Anti-B-Cell Maturation Antigen Chimeric Antigen Receptor T Cells", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, GB, (20180501), vol. 29, no. 5, doi:10.1089/hum.2018.001, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 585 - 601, XP055626881 [Y] 1-5,7-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2018.001 | International search | [A]KR20110126740 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * See abstract; claims 1-31. *; | [A]US9243058 (ARMITAGE RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See abstract; paragraph [0059], claims 1-26. *; | [A]US2016297885 (KUO TRACY CHIA-CHIEN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2017051068 (PILLARISETTI KODANDARAM [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. *; | [A]US2018118842 (BRENTJENS RENIER J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. *; | [A] - SANCHEZ, E. et al., "Soluble B- Cell Maturation Antigen Mediates Tumor-Induced Immune Deficiency in Multiple Myeloma", Clinical Cancer Research, (20160000), vol. 22, no. 13, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-15-2224, pages 3383 - 3397, XP055474325 [A] 1-12 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-15-2224 | by applicant | - MOREAUX et al., Eur J Haematol, (20090000), vol. 83, pages 119 - 129 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP_035738 | - "GenBank Accession", Database accession no. NM_011608 | - Mol. Cells OT, (20090228), pages 225 - 235 | - Cancer Cell, vol. 19, pages 101 - 113 |