EP3813648 - WEARABLE MODULAR EXTRACORPOREAL LIFE SUPPORT DEVICE FOR MOBILE TREATMENT OF SINGLE AND MULTIORGAN FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Geneva Foundation 950 Broadway, Suite 307 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | [2024/22] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states The Geneva Foundation 917 Pacific Avenue Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATCHINSKY, Andriy, I. Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | 02 /
HAREA, George, T. Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | 03 /
WENDORFF, Daniel, S. Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | 04 /
BEELY, Brendan, M. Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | 05 /
ROBERTS, Teryn, R. Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/18] | 01 /
BATCHINSKY, Andriy, I. 917 Pacific Avenue, Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | ||
02 /
HAREA, George, T. 917 Pacific Avenue, Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | |||
03 /
WENDORFF, Daniel, S. 917 Pacific Avenue, Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | |||
04 /
BEELY, Brendan, M. 917 Pacific Avenue, Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | |||
05 /
ROBERTS, Teryn, R. 917 Pacific Avenue, Suite 600 Tacoma, WA 98402 / US | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19826438.4 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US39441 | Priority number, date | US201862690403P | 27.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690403 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020006192 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813648 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3813648 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61M1/16, A61M1/28, A61M1/34 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,IL,US);
A61M1/3667 (IL,US);
A61M1/3666 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61B5/6866 (IL,KR,US);
A61B5/6867 (US);
A61M1/1603 (KR);
A61M1/1698 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M1/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M1/3623 (EP,US);
A61M1/3659 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,IL,US);
A61M5/1723 (EP,IL);
A61M60/00 (IL,KR,US);
A61M60/113 (EP,US);
A61M60/216 (EP,US);
A61M60/232 (EP,US);
A61M60/279 (EP,US);
A61M60/31 (EP,US);
A61M60/37 (EP,US);
A61M60/38 (EP,US);
A61M60/546 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE MODULARE EXTRAKORPORALE LEBENSERHALTENDE VORRICHTUNG ZUR MOBILEN BEHANDLUNG VON EINZEL- UND MULTIORGANVERSAGEN | [2021/18] | English: | WEARABLE MODULAR EXTRACORPOREAL LIFE SUPPORT DEVICE FOR MOBILE TREATMENT OF SINGLE AND MULTIORGAN FAILURE | [2021/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE VITALE EXTRACORPOREL MODULAIRE POUVANT ÊTRE PORTÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT MOBILE D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE D'UN SEUL ORGANE ET DE PLUSIEURS ORGANES | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 03.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24177064.3 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 03.10.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 03.10.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.12.2022 | 30.06.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004254514 (GURA VICTOR [US]); | [XI]US2006241543 (GURA VICTOR [US]); | [XI]US2018078688 (SVITEK ROBERT G [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5043260 (JAUREGUI HUGO O [US]); | [Y]US6736790 (BARBUT DENISE R [US], et al); | [XY]US2006241543 (GURA VICTOR [US]); | [Y]US2015034082 (KIMM GARDNER [US], et al); | [Y]US2015231323 (SPEARMAN PATRICK RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2017361007 (ROY SHUVO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018047956 (KK ADVANCE [JP]) | by applicant | US2004254514 | US2006241543 | US2018078688 |