EP3814376 - TRANSTHYRETIN ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mor Research Applications Ltd. 40 Tuval St, 25th floor Ramat Gan, 5252247 / IL | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Mor Research Applications Ltd. 38 Habarzel Street 6th Floor 6971054 Ramat Hahyal, Tel Aviv / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FASSLER, Michael 5 Haviv Street 7405500 Ness Ziona / IL | 02 /
GEORGE, Jacob 15 Kafrisin Street 6901658 Tel Aviv / IL | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19826665.2 | 26.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019IB55416 | Priority number, date | US201862690116P | 26.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862690116 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020003172 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814376 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61P9/00, A61P25/00, A61K49/00, C07K16/18, G01N33/68 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
A61P9/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (US);
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N33/78 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2317/90 (EP);
C07K2317/92 (EP);
G01N2800/2814 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, G01N33/68, A61K49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | TRANSTHYRETINANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/18] | English: | TRANSTHYRETIN ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/18] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-TRANSTHYRÉTINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/18] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010030203 (BIOCODEX INCUBACAO DE EMPRESAS [PT], et al); | [XI]WO2016120811 (PROTHENA BIOSCIENCES LTD [IE], et al); | [XI]EP3101132 (THE CHEMO-SERO-THERAPEUTIC RES INST [JP]); | International search | [X]WO2015092077 (NEURIMMUNE HOLDING AG [CH]); | by applicant | WO8605807 | WO8901036 | WO9002809 | WO9110737 | WO9201047 | US5122464 | WO9218619 | WO9311236 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5403484 | WO9515982 | US5427908 | WO9520401 | US5516637 | US5571698 | US5580717 | WO9713844 | US5658727 | US5698426 | US5733743 | US5750753 | US5780225 | US5807715 | US5821047 | US5965726 | US5969108 | US6174666 | US6291664 | US6414132 | US2004014194 | US6794498 | WO2009036379 | WO2010030203 | US7709226 | WO2010105256 | WO2012009568 | WO2015092077 | WO2016120811 | EP3101132 |