EP3814279 - A POORLY CRYSTALLINE TRANSITION METAL MOLYBDOTUNGSTATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Stuart R. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
KOSTER, Susan C. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19827536.4 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US39466 | Priority number, date | US201862692020P | 29.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862692020 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020006207 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3814279 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 02.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01G39/06, C01G41/00, B01J21/12, B01J35/02, B01J37/20, C10G45/08, C10G45/60 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
C10G45/08 (EP,US);
B01J27/24 (US);
B01J23/007 (EP);
B01J23/8885 (EP);
B01J35/70 (EP);
B01J37/031 (EP);
B01J37/20 (US);
C01G51/006 (EP);
C01G53/006 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (US);
B01J21/08 (US);
B01J21/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | C01G41/00, C01G39/02, C01G39/06, C01G1/02, C01G1/12, B01J23/30, B01J23/85, B01J23/06, B01J31/18, C10G45/08, C10G45/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | SCHWACH KRISTALLINES ÜBERGANGSMETALLMOLYBDOWOLFRAMAT | [2021/18] | English: | A POORLY CRYSTALLINE TRANSITION METAL MOLYBDOTUNGSTATE | [2021/18] | French: | MOLYBDOTUNGSTATE DE MÉTAL DE TRANSITION FAIBLEMENTCRISTALLIN | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 08.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017165648 (MILLER STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2017165645 (MILLER STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2017165652 (MILLER STUART [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2017165645 (MILLER STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2018169633 (MILLER STUART [US], et al) |