EP3871282 - BATTERY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Nano Network Limited 4 Albert Mews Reed Drive Redhill, Surrey RH1 6TD / GB | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAVES NOGUERA, Juan Scott c/o Global Nano Network Limited 4 Albert Mews Reed Drive Redhill Surrey RH1 6TD / GB | 02 /
MORERA GÓMEZ, María José c/o Global Nano Network Limited 4 Albert Mews Reed Drive Redhill Surrey RH1 6TD / GB | 03 /
CHAVES NOGUERA, Sindy Johanna c/o Global Nano Network Limited 4 Albert Mews Reed Drive Redhill Surrey RH1 6TD / GB | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | McShane, Andrea Renata Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19827782.4 | 25.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019GB53035 | Priority number, date | GB20180017450 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201817450 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084317 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871282 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H01M50/4295 (EP);
H01M10/056 (GB);
H01M10/0565 (US);
H01G11/56 (GB);
H01G9/025 (GB);
H01G9/028 (US);
H01M50/44 (EP);
H01M50/446 (GB);
C08B37/003 (US);
H01M2220/20 (US);
H01M2300/0082 (GB,US);
H01M2300/0085 (GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | BATTERIEZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/35] | English: | BATTERY COMPOSITION | [2021/35] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BATTERIE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 25.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - YING OU ET AL, "Chitosan-based composite membranes containing chitosan-coated carbon nanotubes for polymer electrolyte membranes", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES., GB, (20170928), vol. 29, no. 1, doi:10.1002/pat.4171, ISSN 1042-7147, pages 612 - 622, XP055666819 [X] 1,8-11,17,19,24,25,27,36 * page 613, right-hand column; page 614, figure 1, right-hand column * [I] 5-7,13,16,26,28,29,33-35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pat.4171 | [XP] - SHIN-CHENG JANG ET AL, "Quaternized chitosan/functionalized carbon nanotubes composite anion exchange membranes", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, US, (20190810), vol. 136, no. 30, doi:10.1002/app.47778, ISSN 0021-8995, page 47778, XP055666347 [XP] 1,8,9,11,13,17,19,24-27,36 * page 4778, right-hand column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.47778 |